Pace Supply Corp. v. JCP Industries, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Pace Supply Corp.
Defendant: JCP Industries, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, a Connecticut Corporation, and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv02901
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Pace Supply Corp. (Hatcher, William) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for August 27, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by August 20, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-02901-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 6/6/19.(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pace Supply Corp... (Hatcher, William) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendants JCP Industries, LLC & Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by Pace Supply Corp.. (Hatcher, William) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 #Electronic filing error Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Pace Supply Corp.. Incorrect District Court on the Summons Form. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hatcher, William) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY ON MILLER ACT PAYMENT BOND (40 USC Section 3133) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13381090). Filed by Pace Supply Corp.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Hatcher, William) (Filed on 5/24/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace Supply Corp. v. JCP Industries, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCP Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, a Connecticut Corporation,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pace Supply Corp.
Represented By: William Wallace Hatcher, Jr
Represented By: Robert Scott Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?