SM 10000 Property, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company et al v. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation
Plaintiff: SM 10000 Property, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company and Swinerton Builders, Inc., a California Corporation
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv03054
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M.H. Snow. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M.H. Snow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13514626.) filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Snow, Christopher) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/15/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/17/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 06/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation.. (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #6 Certificate of Service, filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, KAW Standing Orders (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz SE for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re: #2 C orporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation (Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-575667. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13402197). Filed byAllianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meconis, Dianne) (Filed on 6/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SM 10000 Property, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company et al v. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Dianne Jean Meconis
Represented By: Christopher Mark Henry Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM 10000 Property, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By: Linda Diane Kornfeld
Represented By: Valentine Shade Hoy,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swinerton Builders, Inc., a California Corporation
Represented By: Linda Diane Kornfeld
Represented By: Valentine Shade Hoy,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?