Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Turtle Island Restoration Network and Center For Biological Diversity
Defendant: Wilbur Ross and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv03135
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating as moot #12 Motion to Expedite. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting as modified #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Administrative Record.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Administrative Record ) filed byCenter For Biological Diversity. (Kilduff, Catherine) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite , ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION expedite adjudication of extension motion re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Administrative Record filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strippoli, Briena) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Administrative Record filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strippoli, Briena) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross.. (Strippoli, Briena) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Briena Strippoli (Strippoli, Briena) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on Defendants, Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney General on 06/13/19, filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Turtle Island Restoration Network. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Monsell, Kristen) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Turtle Island Restoration Network.. (Monsell, Kristen) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Kilduff, Catherine) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Kilduff, Catherine) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/20/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13412282.). Filed byCenter For Biological Diversity, Turtle Island Restoration Network. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Filed on 6/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Represented By: Briena Strippoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Briena Strippoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turtle Island Restoration Network
Represented By: Catherine Cain Ware Kilduff
Represented By: Miyoko Sakashita
Represented By: Kristen A Monsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Catherine Cain Ware Kilduff
Represented By: Miyoko Sakashita
Represented By: Kristen A Monsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?