Stein v. Electronics For Imaging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Defendant: Richard Kashnow, Gill Cogan, Eric Brown, Electronics For Imaging, Inc., Janice Durbin Chaffin, Dan Maydan, William D. Muir, Jr., Guy Gecht and Tom Georgens
Case Number: 4:2019cv03444
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shiva Stein (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shiva Stein.. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by William D. Muir, Jr waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Dan Maydan waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Richard Kashnow waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Tom Georgens waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Guy Gecht waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Electronics For Imaging, Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Gill Cogan waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Janice Durbin Chaffin waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shiva Stein. Service waived by Eric Brown waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Eric Brown, Janice Durbin Chaffin, Gill Cogan, Electronics For Imaging, Inc., Guy Gecht, Tom Georgens, Richard Kashnow, Dan Maydan, William D. Muir, Jr. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shiva Stein (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Violations of Sections 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13444972.). Filed byShiva Stein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Electronics For Imaging, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kashnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronics For Imaging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Durbin Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Maydan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Muir, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Gecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Georgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Represented By: Brittany Nicole DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?