Meyers Financial Services, Inc. et al v. Markel American Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Lillian Meyers and Meyers Financial Services, Inc.
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Co.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03531
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court finds that the Motion to Dismiss #10 is appropriate for resolution without oral argument pursuant to L.R. 7-1(b). Accordingly, the 8/14/2019 hearing is vacated and the Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #16 Objection, to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice by Markel American Insurance Co.. (Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS to re #13 Objection, #11 Request for Judicial Notice, #15 Request for Judicial Notice TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Lillian Meyers, Meyers Financial Services, Inc.. (Wanser, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST for Judicial Notice filed by Markel American Insurance Co.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2019) Modified on 7/18/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byMarkel American Insurance Co.. (Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTIONS to re #11 Request for Judicial Notice by Lillian Meyers, Meyers Financial Services, Inc.. (Wanser, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition of #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lillian Meyers, Meyers Financial Services, Inc.(Wanser, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Markel American Insurance Co. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Markel American Insurance Co. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 7/8/2019. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/24/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Markel American Insurance Co... (Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Markel American Insurance Co. (Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Markel American Insurance Co. identifying Other Affiliate Markel Corporation for Markel American Insurance Co.. (Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT BY DEFENDANT MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV264560. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13450402). Filed byMarkel American Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Richard R. Johnson In Support Of Notice Of Removal And Removal To Federal Court By Defendant Markel American Insurance Company, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perlis, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers Financial Services, Inc. et al v. Markel American Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Meyers
Represented By: Michael Russell Wanser
Represented By: Lewis Russell Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meyers Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Russell Wanser
Represented By: Lewis Russell Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael Fredrick Perlis
Represented By: Richard Ray Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?