California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute v. Oxford Health Insurance Inc et al
Plaintiff: California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company and Oxford Health Insurance Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv03533
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byCalifornia Spine and Neurosurgery Institute. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2019 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #14 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #11 . (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 Clerk's Notice,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, To Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company, Oxford Health Insurance Inc., California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting (Proposed) Order to Continue Hearing on Deft's MTD)(Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified on 7/22/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that due to Magistrate Judge Ryu's unavailability, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss previously set for 9/12/2019 at 1:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 9/19/2019 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute.. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/24/2019. Replies due by 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE of Confirmation of Notifying State Court of Removal by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company of Notifying State Court of Removal (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company.. (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT UNTIL JULY 10, 2019 filed by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company and California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute. (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 6/25/2019) Modified on 6/26/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company Proof of Service re Order Setting Initial CMC; Judge's Standing Order; Consenting to Magistrate Judge Brochure; Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge; Standing Order for Northern District (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company Proof of Service re Civil Cover Sheet (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent UHIC Holdings, Inc. a wholly owned subsidiary of United HealthCare Services, Inc., a wholly owned subsidiary of UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated, a publicly traded company, Corporate Parent Oxford Health Insurance, Inc a wholly owned subsidiary of UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a wholly owned subsidiary of UHIC Holdings, Inc a wholly owned subsidiary of United HealthCare Services, Inc a wholly owned subsidiary of UnitedHealth Group, Inc, Corporate Parent California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute, Plaintiff, Other Affiliate Adebukola Onibokun, M.D., medical provider of services at issue for Oxford Health Insurance Inc, United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(B) (Diversity) from Superior Court of Alameda County California. Their case number is RG19012100. (No Process) (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13450661). Filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company, Oxford Health Insurance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sylvia Joo in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 USC 1441(B) (Diversity), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute v. Oxford Health Insurance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtney Culwell Hill
Represented By: Sylvia Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Insurance Inc
Represented By: Courtney Culwell Hill
Represented By: Sylvia Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?