California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al

Plaintiff: California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co. and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03552
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/24/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 07/24/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute.. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/22/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 20, 2019 Answer filed in Alameda County Superior Court by JP Morgan Chase & CO and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company on June 19, 2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JP Morgan Chase & Co., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company re #3 Civil Cover Sheet, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Hardy, Jessica) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by JP Morgan Chase & Co., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company . (Hardy, Jessica) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet is not complete. No judge assignment will be made until the document is re-filed in it's entirety. Please complete section: IV. NATURE OF SUITSubmit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by JP Morgan Chase & Co., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, Other Affiliate JP Morgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase & Co., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Hardy, Jessica) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19012094. (no process) (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13451620). Filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardy, Jessica) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Jessica Brooke Hardy
Represented By: Bryan Scott Westerfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica Brooke Hardy
Represented By: Bryan Scott Westerfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?