Zietzke v. United States of America
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: William Zietzke
Case Number: 4:2019cv03761
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 8/2/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Zietzke. United States of America served on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Stack, Richard) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] * Re-File as Summons Returned Executed as to USA * Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Certificate of Service filed by William Zietzke (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Zietzke re #1 Petition, #4 Summons Issued as to USA (Stack, Richard) (Filed on 7/15/2019) Modified on 7/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stack, Richard) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Quash IRS Summons Served on Coinbase Inc. against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13475889). Filed byWilliam Zietzke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Richard G. Stack and Exhibits A-E, #3 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits F-G, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stack, Richard) (Filed on 6/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zietzke v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Zietzke
Represented By: Richard Gordon Stack
Represented By: John M McWilliams
Represented By: Joseph Phillips Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?