Ribot v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Hugo Ribot
Defendant: W. Vaughn, Dr. Christopher Smith, Dr. Gregory C Tesluk, Kabir Matharn, Robert Rudas, Jalal Soltanian, James Chau, Stephen Tseng and Dr. Kirsch
Case Number: 4:2019cv04044
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC RMH
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Case has been successfully transferred to the Eastern District of California. Their case no. is 2:19-cv-1361. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Sent copy of complaint Dkt.No. 1 to plaintiff. (aea, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hugo Ribot. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Hugo Ribot. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Chau, Firsch, Kabir Matharn, Robert Rudas, Christopher Smith, Jalal Soltanian Zadeh, Gregory C Tesluk, Stephen Tseng, W. Vaughn Filed by Hugo Ribot. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #3 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ribot v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Ribot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gregory C Tesluk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kabir Matharn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rudas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalal Soltanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?