Lambda Labs, Inc. v. Lambda, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lambda Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Lambda, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04060
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #84 Discovery Order, Terminate Motions filed by Lambda, Inc.. Responses due by 8/14/2020. Replies due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 86 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing ONE list of names of ALL counsel who will be participating in the hearing to JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than August 3, 2020 by 2:00 P.M. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619067542?pwd=YktBS2VoNm1JYW9xMS91dk9rUzZudz09Meeting ID: 161 906 7542Password: 959588Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM. (Related documents(s) 64 ) (This is a text-only entry generate d by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 85 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/28/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Discovery Order re: #81 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lambda, Inc., Lambda Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/17/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 7/17/2020 at 2:30 p.m., by Zoom Videoconferencing.Total Time in Court: 37 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorneys: Jennifer L. Taylor, Esq. and Nicholas T. Herrera, Esq. Defendant Attorneys: Karineh Khachatourian, Esq. (argued) and Nikolaus Woloszczuk, Esq. Proceeding: Discovery hearing held. Argument heard. Matter submitted. Court to issue order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/17/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 82 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Video Camera hearing set for 7/17/2020 02:30 PM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than 7/16/2020 at 2:00 pm. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/webinar/register/WN_gWLyENlvSXmiqY0EpkFb4AMeeting ID: 160 471 7692Password: 576843Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera hearing set for 7/17/2020 02:30 PM. (Related documents(s) #81 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no do cument associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 81 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/10/2020) Modified on 7/13/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Discovery Order re: #79 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/30/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 79 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Complaints About Lambda School filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) Modified on 6/29/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2020 Filing 78 Status Update Regarding June 24, 2020 Joint Letter Brief filed by Lambda, Inc. and Lambda Labs, Inc. (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 6/24/2020) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2020 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing held on 6/22/2020 by Zoom Video Conferencing.FTR Time: Zoom Recording 10:05-10:24 Total Time: 19 minutes. The Zoom recording was sent to all counsel by email. If counsel require a certified transcript by a Court Reporter they should file their request on ECF using the Courts procedure: Login to ECF - select-Other Filings/Other Documents/Audio Recordings of Court Procedures. Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer L. Taylor, Esq. (argued matter); Nick Herrera, Esq. Defendant Attorney: Karineh Kachatorian, Esq.Proceedings: Discovery Conference held re ECF Docket No. 74. The Court and the parties discussed ECF No. 74, and it was resolved as stated on the record. For the joint discovery letter brief that is due June 26, 2020, the Court extended the page limits from 10 to 12. For the joint discovery letter brief that is due June 24, 2020, if the parties are able to resolve that dispute, they shall file a notice so informing the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2020) Modified on 6/22/2020 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2020 Filing 76 Updated Joint Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Lambda School Document Custodians filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/19/2020) Modified on 6/22/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2020 Filing 75 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Video Camera hearing set for 6/22/2020 10:00 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than 6/19/2020 by 4:00 pm. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/webinar/register/WN_zn7VRGp7RY-EATRxrzKrwwNOTE: Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court.Meeting ID: 161 665 6640Password: 264864Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Video Camera hearing set for 6/22/2020 10:00 AM. (Related documents(s) #74 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Case division information is incorrect. The correct information is Oakland Division. Re: #74 Letter Brief filed by Lambda La bs, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 74 Joint Letter Brief Regarding The Preservation of Certain Data Sources (per Court Order ECF No. 69) filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/16/2020) Modified on 6/17/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Discovery Order re: #70 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Concerning ESI Custodians. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/15/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Discovery Order re: #71 Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Phasing of ESI Discovery. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/15/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 71 Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Phasing of ESI Discovery filed by Lambda, Inc. and Lambda Labs, Inc.. (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 6/12/2020) Modified on 6/15/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2020 Filing 70 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Concerning ESI Custodians and What Data Sources to Collect From (per Court Order ECF. No. 69) filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/12/2020) Modified on 6/15/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Discovery Order re briefing deadlines discussed at 6/4/2020 telephonic conference. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 6/4/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Telphonic Discovery Hearing held on 6/4/2020 at 1:30 p.m.AT&T Recording: Yes - 1:31-2:05Total Time: 34 minutesPlaintiff Attorneys: Nicholas Herrera, Esq.; Jennifer Taylor, Esq. Defendant Attorney: Karineh Khachatourain, Esq. Proceedings: Telephonic Discovery Conference held. Schedule set for various pending Discovery issues. Court to issue order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2020)
June 1, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE: Scheduling Telephonic Discovery Conference Call, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson A Telephonic Discovery Conference Call is scheduled for 6/4/2020 at 1:30 p.m., about the status of pending discovery issue(s).Counsel shall call the following number: 1-888-684-8852/Access Code: 2925506If counsel have any questions please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, by email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2020. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/25/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/17/2020. Designation of Experts due by 1/28/2021. Dispositive Motion due by 6/23/2021. Rebuttal Reports due by 2/25/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 - 11/15/2021 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Per Order 64 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEThe case management conference currently scheduled for June 2, 2020 is CONTINUED to August 4, 2020. An updated case management conference is due July 28, 2020. The Court will issue separate amended orders (1) extending the case deadlines and (2) referring the parties' discovery disputes to a Magistrate Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 63 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing ONE list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than June 1, 2020 by 2:00 PM.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/89657231136?pwd=cEFjR254OVJNQVIyT2VDbzFZeldadz09Meeting ID: 896 5723 1136Password: 533342Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 62 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Corrected) Further Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2020 Filing 61 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES Save for the May 26, 2020 deadline to file a case management statement, all deadlines in this case are provisionally extended 30 days to give the parties and the Court the opportunity to discuss a more comprehensive schedule adjustment at the June 2, 2020 case management conference. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 59 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #58 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Modification of Case Management Scheduling Order (ECF 31) ) filed byLambda Labs, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 58 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Modification of Case Management Scheduling Order (ECF 31) filed by Lambda, Inc.. Responses due by 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karineh Khachatourian, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Nathan D Shaffer , Diana M. Rutowski, and Eileen Z. Aghnami (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Motions terminated: #55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Lambda, Inc., Lambda Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 55 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas T. Herrera, #2 Exhibit 1)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/24/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2020 Filing 54 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Lambda Labs' Answer to Amended Counterclaims byLambda Labs, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Further Settlement Conference held by Zoom on 4/22/2020. Case did not settle. No further settlement proceedings set at this time. (Total Time in Court: 2 hours, 45 minutes.) (Not reported.) Attorneys for Plaintiff: Jennifer Lee Taylor; Nicholas Herrera. Client Representative: Stephen Balaban. Attorney for Defendant: Karineh Khachatourian. Client Representatives: Cecilia Ziniti; Austen Allred. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 52 First Amended and Supplemental ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Lambda Labs, Inc. byLambda, Inc.. (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Settlement Conference: Notice is given that a Settlement Conference set for 4/22/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The settlement conference will take place via Zoom conference in lieu of live appearances. The Court expects attorneys and clients to be available all day during the settlement conference and not to schedule other matters during that time. Attorneys and their clients may be in separate locations, but attorneys and clients must have computers with cameras and audio capability. The Court will provide information to allow attorneys and parties to join the conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2020 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/25/2020. The Court and parties selected 4/21/2020 and 4/22/2020 as potential dates for the further settlement conference. Counsel shall confer with their clients and notify the Court by email (SKSettlement@cand.uscourts.gov) no later than Friday 3/27/2020 which date is preferred. (Total Time in Court: 10 minutes.) (Not reported.) Attorneys for Plaintiff: Jennifer Lee Taylor; Nicholas Herrera. Attorney for Defendant: Karineh Khachatourian. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) The case management conference previously set for 3/27/20 is CONTINUED. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN CASE DEADLINES filed by Lambda, Inc. and Lambda Labs, Inc. (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2020. Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2020 02:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lambda, Inc.. Filed byLambda Labs, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2020. re #37 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Lambda Labs, Inc., #32 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims filed by Lambda, Inc. ; granting #37 Motion to Amend/Correct ; FTR Time: 2:14 - 2:40. Attachment: Minute Order. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #32 Motion for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Telephone Conference: Notice is given that the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2020 is continued to 3/25/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel shall use the dial-in information provided by the Court to participate. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 43 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 28 Case Management Conference - Initial, ), by Lambda, Inc.. Court will send to Lillian Fass at Lillian.Fass@rimonlaw.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-14265726). (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk (Woloszczuk, Nikolaus) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Karineh Khachatourian (Khachatourian, Karineh) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY (re #37 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint ) filed byLambda Labs, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint ) filed byLambda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Shaffer Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Settlement Conference held on 1/31/2020. Case did not settle. (Total Time in Court: 5 hours.) (Not reported.) AFTER COURT: The Court sets a Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/17/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The Court will circulate dial-in information by separate email to counsel three days before. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Jennifer Taylor; Nicholas Herrera. Client Representative: Stephen Balaban. Attorneys for Defendant: Nathan Shaffer; Diana Rutowski. Client Representatives: Cecilia Zinti; Matthew Wyndowe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Lambda Labs, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/13/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #32 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims filed by Lambda, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 28, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 35 Statement of Non-Opposition re #32 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims filed byLambda Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2020 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/18/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/18/2019. Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 1:00 PM. The Court will issue a settlement conference order. (Total Time in Court: 10 minutes.) (Not reported.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Jennifer Taylor. Attorney for Defendant: Diana Rutowski. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims filed by Lambda, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/2/2020. Replies due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2020. Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Designation of Experts due by 6/15/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 7/15/2020. Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/29/2020. Dispositive Motion due by 8/19/2020. Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Selection set for 1/11/2021 - 1/21/2021 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 17, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/16/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Settlement. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 13, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/10/2019. Written scheduling order to issue.FTR Time: 2:33 - 2:45. Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer Taylor, Robert Sandoval. Defendant Attorney: Diana Rutowski, Nathan Shaffer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lambda Labs, Inc. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 25 Joint Initial CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. and Lambda, Inc. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/3/2019) Modified on 12/4/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 Lambda School's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand byLambda, Inc.. (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 21, 2019. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Zary Aghnami (Aghnami, Eileen) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Rutowski (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Lambda, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Austin Allred, Other Affiliate GV, Other Affiliate Y Combinator, Other Affiliate S Benjamin Nelson, Other Affiliate Tandem Capital, Other Affiliate Bedrock Capital for Lambda, Inc.. (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend the Deadline to Answer the #1 Complaint filed by Lambda, Inc., Lambda Labs, Inc. (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 8/21/2019) Modified on 8/22/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D Shaffer (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/8/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lambda Labs, Inc. re #9 Notice of Appearance, #8 Notice of Appearance, #7 Patent/Trademark Report, #2 Proposed Summons, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Herrera, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lambda Labs, Inc... (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Santos Sandoval on behalf of Plaintiff Lambda Labs, Inc. (Sandoval, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Timothy Herrera on behalf of Plaintiff Lambda Labs, Inc. (Herrera, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark infringement. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lambda, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Lambda Labs, Inc. (AMENDED). (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Ev ent is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:[1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Lambda Labs, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Trademark Infringement, False Designation Of Origin, and Unfair Competition; Demand For Jury Trial against Lambda, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13520777.). Filed byLambda Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambda Labs, Inc. v. Lambda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambda, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen Zary Aghnami
Represented By: Nathan D Shaffer
Represented By: Diana Rutowski
Represented By: Karineh Khachatourian
Represented By: Nikolaus Andrew Woloszczuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lambda Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Robert Santos Sandoval
Represented By: Nicholas Timothy Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?