United States of America v. BTC-e et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: BTC-e, Alexander Vinnik and Canton Business Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv04281
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3545
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Ault, Kirstin) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BTC-e, Alexander Vinnik. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/8/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Ault, Kirstin) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Ault, Kirstin) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BTC-e, Alexander Vinnik. Filed byUnited States of America. (Exempt from Filing Fee) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ault, Kirstin) (Filed on 7/25/2019) Modified on 7/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. BTC-e et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTC-e
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Vinnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton Business Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kirstin M. Ault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?