Wood et al v. Marathon Refining Logistics Service LLC
Plaintiff: JANICE WOOD, AARON DIETRICH and ANTHONY ALFARO
Defendant: MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04287
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY (re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byMARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC. (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byANTHONY ALFARO, AARON DIETRICH, JANICE WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jannah V. Manansala in support of Opposition to Def's Mot to Dismiss Pls' Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl of Jannah V. Manansala in support of Opposition to Def's Mot to Dismiss Pls' Complaint, #3 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit A to Decl of Jannah V. Manansala in support of Opposition to Def's Mot to Dismiss Pls' Complaint, #4 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit B to Decl of Jannah V. Manansala in support of Opposition to Def's Mot to Dismiss Pls' Complaint, #5 Proposed Order Denying Def's Mot to Dismiss Pls' Complaint, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Manansala, Jannah) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/13/2019. Replies due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Kopp in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 11/4/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE : The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC.. (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC. (Manesis, Mary) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10 /17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC of Court's Standing Order (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of JUSTIN LAWRENCE in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byMARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of TIMOTHY M. RUSCHE in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byMARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC identifying Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Other Affiliate MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC for MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC. (Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C19-01261. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13555012). Filed byMARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rusche, Timothy) (Filed on 7/25/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Marathon Refining Logistics Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARATHON REFINING LOGISTICS SERVICE LLC
Represented By: Timothy Michael Rusche
Represented By: Michael Warner Kopp
Represented By: William J. Dritsas
Represented By: Mary Deanna Manesis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE WOOD
Represented By: Alexander S. Nazarov
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Represented By: Jannah Vanessa Manansala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON DIETRICH
Represented By: Alexander S. Nazarov
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Represented By: Jannah Vanessa Manansala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ALFARO
Represented By: Alexander S. Nazarov
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Represented By: Jannah Vanessa Manansala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?