Ng v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Wayne Ng
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv04316
Filed: July 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant To Respond To Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, and Wayne Ng. (Narita, Tomio) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Ng. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Michel, James) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificate/Proof of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3 -4 regarding first page requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Certificate of Service filed by Wayne Ng (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Ng re #4 Summons Issued Service of Summons on JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Michel, James) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wayne Ng.. (Michel, James) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Michel, James) (Filed on 7/28/2019)
July 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13559215.). Filed by Wayne Ng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Michel, James) (Filed on 7/28/2019) Modified on 7/29/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ng v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Tomio Buck Narita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Ng
Represented By: James Anthony Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?