Shaw v. Grails SF LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Shaw
Defendant: San Francisco Mandarin Baptist Church, San Francisco, California and Grails SF LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04525
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION for dismissal of only Defendant San Francisco Mandarin Baptist Church without prejudice filed by Cameron Shaw. (Moore, Tanya) (Filed on 9/30/2019) Modified on 9/30/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Eugene Moore on behalf of Plaintiff (Moore, Tanya) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Mandarin Baptist Church, San Francisco, California.. (Griffith, Amanda) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand bySan Francisco Mandarin Baptist Church, San Francisco, California. (Griffith, Amanda) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cameron Shaw.. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Grails SF LLC, San Francisco Mandarin Baptist Church, San Francisco, California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 *** CORRECTED COMPLAINT *** Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against Grails SF LLC, San Francisco Mandarin Baptist Church, San Francisco, California. Filed by Cameron Shaw. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13577259.). Filed by Cameron Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Grails SF LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Mandarin Baptist Church, San Francisco, California
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grails SF LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Shaw
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?