Del Castillo v. City and County of San Francisco, Department of Elections
Plaintiff: Eve Del Castillo
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Department of Elections
Case Number: 4:2019cv04561
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION #2 AND SCREENING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Plaintiff must file a first amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies identified in this screening order by 10/25/2019. The initial case management conference scheduled for 11/6/2019 01:30 PM is VACATED and will be reset by the court at a later date if appropriate. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eve Del Castillo. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Time filed by Eve Del Castillo. Responses due by 9/10/2019. Replies due by 9/17/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Shorten Time to Court Order before 8-12-19, 11 A.M., filed by Eve Del Castillo. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eve Del Castillo. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Request for a Proposed Initiative Measure be Court Ordered off the Ballot, against City and County of San Francisco, Department of Elections. Filed by Eve Del Castillo. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #2 Corrected Complaint) (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Castillo v. City and County of San Francisco, Department of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Department of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Del Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?