Swienton v. Santa Cruz County Board of Supervisors
Plaintiff: Mitch Swienton and Mitchell E. Sousa
Defendant: Santa Cruz County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 4:2019cv04689
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
2 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Mailed Docket #8 to Plaintiff's new address. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Mail sent to Mitch Swienton returned as undeliverable re #8 Reassignment Order. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mitch Swienton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mitch Swienton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from M. Swienton requesting to amend Doe defendants (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter dated 8/22/2019 from Mitchell Sousa Swienton re summons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mitch Swienton.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mitch Swienton. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Santa Cruz County Board of Supervisors (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Mitch Swienton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swienton v. Santa Cruz County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Swienton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell E. Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?