City and County of San Francisco et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Kevin McAleenen, Department of Homeland Security, Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenen and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Petitioner: Community Healthcare Network, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, America's Essential Hospitals, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al., Fiscal Policy Institute, Public Health Law Watch, Families USA, Boundless Immigration, American Public Health Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, Community Catalyst, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, American Hospital Association, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Economic Progress Institute, Oasis Legal Services, Child Care Law Center, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Kids Forward, The Federation of American Hospitals, Northeastern Universitys Center for Health Policy and Law, American College of Physicians, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, The Children's Hospital Association, Treatment Action Group, American Academy of Nursing, California Immigrant Policy Center, Community Action Marin, American Academy of Pediatrics, Health Care For All, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Health in Justice Action Lab, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, American Medical Association, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, New York Immigration Coalition and Welcome Project
Amicus Curiae: The Cities of Los Angeles and Oakland, California; Harris County, Texas; and 26 Additional Cities, Counties, and Local Government Agencies, City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, City of Seattle, Washington, City of Los Angeles, City of Santa Monica, California, City of Dallas, Texas, PHI, American Society on Aging, City Of Oakland, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, City of West Hollywood, California, National Council on Aging, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, County of Monterey, California, City of Stockton, California, Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles, California, City of Minneapolis, Minnesota, County of King, Washington, City of Baltimore, Maryland, MAZON, City of Holyoke, Massachusetts, City of Sacramento, California, County of San Mateo, California, National Hispanic Council on Aging, City of South Bend, Indiana, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Somerville, Massachusetts, City and County of Denver, Colorado, Caring Across Generations, County of Marin, California, City of Detroit, Michigan, County of Travis, Texas, City of Albuquerque, New Mexico, Justice in Aging, County of Santa Cruz, California, City of Austin, Texas, City of Santa Fe, New Mexico, City of Houston, Texas, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars and County of Harris, Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv04717
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton regarding Administrative Motions to Manually File Administrative Record.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 4:19-cv-04980-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #140 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 140 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security and Kevin McAleen, and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 1/8/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2020 Filing 139 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to Manually File Administrative Record filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Responses due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Kolsky Declaration), #2 Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER of USCA: Appellees Motion for Reconsideration En Banc, filed December 27, 2019, is hereby GRANTED as to #124 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenen (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER of USCA as to #124 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenen (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton terminating (120) Motion to Stay in case 19-cv-04717-PJH and (125) Motion to Stay in case 19-cv-04975-PJH Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER of USCA as to #124 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenen (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 134 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/14/19, before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (132 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2020. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/14/2019 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by City and County of San Francisco, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 133 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2019. ***Correction of hearing date.*** Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 131 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2019. Dispositive Motion due by 1/16/2020. Cross Motions due by 2/19/2020. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 130 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the hearing on #120 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction set for 12/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Waiver of Reply and Hearing by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services re #120 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2019 Filing 128 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #120 MOTION to Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal filed by County of Santa Clara. (Edwards, Hannah) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2019 Filing 127 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City and County of San Francisco, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 11/7/2019) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER of USCA as to #124 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenen (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 125 USCA Case Number 19-17213 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #124 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenen. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #115 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 123 Declaration of Daniel Renaud in Support of #120 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Related document(s) #120 ) (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No Title Page Re: #121 Declaration in Support, filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenen.Decl arations e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 regarding first page requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 122 Proposed Order re #120 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 121 Declaration of Daniel Renaud in Support of #120 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Related document(s) #120 ) (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 120 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/8/2019. Replies due by 11/15/2019. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #118 Joint Motion for Relief from Referral to ADR Multi-Option Program.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 118 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief from Automatic Referral to the ADR Multi-Option Program filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 10/23/2019) Modified on 10/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION to Withdraw #116 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. Responses due by 10/31/2019. Replies due by 11/7/2019. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Missing Proposed Order Re: #116 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .A proposed order required in accordance with L.R. 5-1(g). Please file a p roposed order ONLY and link it to the Motion. The event is: Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Order (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. Responses due by 10/30/2019. Replies due by 11/6/2019. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 115 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAssociated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 4:19-cv-04980-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/11/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Draft Injunction by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/7/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Filing 112 Letter from CCSF and all Plaintiffs and [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Record Citation of Evidence of Harms (Refer to Dkt. No. #107 ) by City and County of San Francisco (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2019 Filing 110 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/02/19, before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (111 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 124 in 4:19-cv-04980-PJH, 108 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order, (110 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH) Transcript Order, (109 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/02/2019 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by City and County of San Francisco, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/2/2019 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/2/2019. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Correction))(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 28, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Price Davis (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Davis, Ethan) (Filed on 9/28/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 104 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCity and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Rajendra, Raphael) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 103 City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by County of Santa Clara. (Rajendra, Raphael) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI BRIEFS (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 14, 2019 Filing 101 Appendix to #100 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae the Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #100 filed by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/16/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by California Immigrant Policy Center, Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Economic Progress Institute, Oasis Legal Services, Community Action Marin, Child Care Law Center, Boundless Immigration, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, Kids Forward. Responses due by 9/27/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany N. Lovejoy, #2 [Proposed] Brief of Amici Curiae, #3 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Krumplitsch, Susan) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 98 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Edward T. Waters. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Phillip A. Escoriaza. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher J. Frisina. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Emily Nash. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew London. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wendy Parmet. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Cohen. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, California Food Policy Advocates, California League of United Latin American Citizens, Center for the Study of Social Policy, Childrens Defense Fund-New York, Childrens HealthWatch, The Childrens Partnership, Citizens Committee for Children of New York, Comunidades Unidas, First Focus on Children, Kansas Appleseed, Center for Law and Justice, Inc., Los Angeles Regional Food Bank, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Mississippi Center for Justice, National Law Center on Homelessness & Poverty, National Low Income Housing Coalition, National WIC Association, Oregon Food Bank, Prevention Institute, Sant La, Haitian Neighborhood Center, Inc., South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Utahns Against Hunger, Virginia Poverty Law Center. Responses due by 9/26/2019. Replies due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Thacher, Frances Cheston) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristyn DeFilipp. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christian Springer. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sean Marotta. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans - Ayman El-Mohandes, MBBCh, MD, MPH, Barbara K. Rimer, DrPH, MPH, Boris Lushniak, MD, MPH, David B. Allison, PhD, Edith A. Parker, MPH, DrPH, G. Thomas Chandler, MS, PhD, Hilary Godwin, PhD, Karen Drenkard, PhD, RN, NEA-BC, FAAN, Laura A. Siminoff, PhD, Linda P. Fried, MD, MPH, Lynn R. Goldman, MD, MPH, MS, Mark A. Schuster, MD, PhD, Michael C. Lu, MD, MS, MPH, Pamela R. Jeffries, PhD, RN, FAAN, ANEF, FSSH, Paula Lantz, PhD, Sandro Galea, MD, DrPH, Sherry Glied, PhD, MA, Sten H. Vermund, MD, PhD, Thomas E. Burroughs, PhD, MS, MA; Chairs - Alan G. Wasserman, MD, MACP, Becky Slifkin, PhD, Claire D. Brindis, DrPH, David M. Keepnews, PhD, JD, RN, NEA-BC, FAAN, Jane Thorpe, JD, Karen A. McDonnell, PhD; and Scholars - Alan B. Cohen, Sc.D., Allison K. Hoffman, JD, Amita N. Vyas, PhD, MHS, Andy Schneider, JD, Benjamin D. Sommers, MD, PhD, Colleen M. Grogan, PhD, Daniel Skinner, PhD, David M. Frankford, JD, David Michaels, PhD, MPH, Diana J. Mason, RN, PhD, FAAN, Dora L. Hughes, MD, MPH, Harold Pollark, PhD, Janet Heinrich, DrPH, RN, FAAN, Jeffrey Levi, PhD, Jillian Catalanotti, MD, MPH, FACP, Joan Alker, Jonathan Oberlander, PhD, Julia Zoe Beckerman, JD, MPH, Katherine Horton, RN, MPH, JD, Katherine Swartz, PhD, Krista M. Perreira, PhD, Lynn A. Blewett, PhD, MA, Mark A. Peterson, PhD, Maureen Byrnes, MPA, Melissa M. Goldstein, JD, Michael K. Gusmano, PhD, Naomi Seiler, JD, Neal Halfon, MD, MPH, Nicole Huberfeld, JD, Pam Silberman, JD, DrPH, Rand E. Rosenblatt, JD, Sara Rosenbaum, JD, Sylvia A. Law, JD, Timothy Stoltzfus Jost, JD, Timothy M. Westmoreland, JD, Wendy K. Mariner, JD, LLM, MPH, William B. Borden, MD, FACC, FAHA. Responses due by 9/26/2019. Replies due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars (Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Edward T. Waters ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687118.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/9/2019 filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Phillip A. Escoriaza ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687099.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/9/2019 filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Escoriaza, Phillip) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Christopher J. Frisina ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687023.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/09/2019 filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Frisina for Kathryn E. Doi (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 80 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and have been added to this case: City of Los Angeles, City Of Oakland, County of Harris, Texas, City of Albuquerque, New Mexico, City of Austin, Texas, City of Baltimore, Maryland, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Dallas, Texas, City of Detroit, Michigan, City of Holyoke, Massachusetts, City of Houston, Texas, City of Minneapolis, Minnesota, City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, City of Sacramento, California, City of Santa Fe, New Mexico, City of Santa Monica, California, City of Seattle, Washington, City of Somerville, Massachusetts, City of South Bend, Indiana, City of Stockton, California, City of West Hollywood, California, City and County of Denver, Colorado, County of Marin, California, County of Monterey, California, County of San Mateo, California, County of Santa Cruz, California, County of King, Washington, County of Travis, Texas and Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles, California (This is a text-only entry.) (Goldstein, Danielle) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Emily Nash ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696653.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Nash, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vicere: Andrew London ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696640.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (London, Andrew) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Health Law Advocates, Inc. and 23 Other Organizations Interested in Public Health in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Kristyn DeFilipp ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696271.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern Universitys Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (DeFilipp, Kristyn) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Christian Springer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696112.) filed by Health Law Advocates, Inc.. (Springer, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Wendy Parmet ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695310.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Cohen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695285.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Jonathan Lowe (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Sean Marotta ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13694870.) filed by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, The Children's Hospital Association, The Federation of American Hospitals. (Marotta, Sean) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by American Hospital Association, America's Essential Hospitals, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, The Children's Hospital Association, The Federation of American Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Amici Curiae Brief, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Gonzales, Michelle) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Dermody (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI BRIEFS. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Natalie Kean. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Regan Bailey. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Denny Chan. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Owen T. Masters. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Russell L. Hirshhorn. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Assi, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Kean ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687766.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Kean, Natalie) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Regan Bailey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687617.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Bailey, Regan) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Denny Chan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687476.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Chan, Denny) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Owen Masters ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687116.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Masters, Owen) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Cities of Los Angeles and Oakland, California; Harris County, Texas; and 26 Additional Cities, Counties, and Local Government Agencies. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File)(Goldstein, Danielle) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Russell Hirschhorn ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13686975.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Hirschhorn, Russell) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Maria Assi (Assi, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Opposition due by 9/13/2019. Reply due by 9/20/2019. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #52 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATED REQUEST and Proposed Order for Order Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, County of Santa Clara, City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/5/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case C-19-4717 is related to case C-19-4980-PJH. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/30/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE re #19 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Michael Kolsky (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #19 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by La Clinica De La Raza, California Primary Care Association, Maternal and Child Health Access, Farmworker Justice, Counsel on American Islamic Relations-California, AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Central American Resource Center, Korean Resource Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship, #2 Exhibit Order Directing Parties to File Response, #3 Exhibit As filed Response iso Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determ Relationship of Cases)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 46 Proposed Order re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities [Proposed] Order Granting City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by City and County of San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 45 Declaration of Miguel Marquez in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Miguel Marquez In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 44 Request for Judicial Notice re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Request for Judicial Notice in Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 43 Declaration of Sara Cody in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Sara Cody In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 42 Declaration of Angela Shing in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Angela Shing In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 41 Declaration of Reymundo Espinoza in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Reymundo Espinoza In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 40 Declaration of Paul E. Lorenz in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Paul E. Lorenz In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Lisa M. Newstrom in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Lisa M. Newstrom In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Mohan Kanungo in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Mohan Kanungo In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 37 Declaration of Jennifer LeBarre in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Jennifer LeBarre In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 36 Declaration of Liliana Sandoval in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Liliana Sandoval In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 35 Declaration of Priti Rane in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Priti Rane In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 34 Declaration of Irene Sung in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Irene Sung In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 33 Declaration of Susan Ehrlich in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Susan Ehrlich In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 32 Declaration of Hali Hammer in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Hali Hammer In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 31 Declaration of Gretchen Paule in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Gretchen Paule In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 Declaration of Tomas Aragon in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Tomas Aragon In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration of Greg Wagner in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Greg Wagner In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of Krista Blyth-Gaeta in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Krista Blyth-Gaeta In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Peri Weisberg in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Peri Weisberg In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 Declaration of Susie Smith in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Susie Smith In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration of Trent Rhorer Declaration of Trent Rhorer In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 Declaration of Adrienne Pon in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Adrienne Pon In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 Declaration of Tom Wong in Support of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Tom Wong In Support of City and County of San Francisco and County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/11/2019. Replies due by 9/18/2019. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/28/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Raphael N. Rajendra (Rajendra, Raphael) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case C-17-4717-PJH is related to C-19-4975. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/27/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19-cv- 4980-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/22/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/22/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration William Downer ISO Motion to Relate, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Relate, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Downer, William) (Filed on 8/21/2019) Modified on 8/22/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/21/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Susan Trice (Trice, Laura) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco Proof of Service (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Blau Spiegel (Spiegel, Julia) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Luke Edwards (Edwards, Hannah) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Clara.. (Spiegel, Julia) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Rosil Mere (Mere, Yvonne) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Goldberg (Goldberg, Matthew) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald P. Flynn (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jennifer Eisenberg (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Herrera, Dennis) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13605223.). Filed by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrera, Dennis) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City and County of San Francisco et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Represented By: Ronald P. Flynn
Represented By: Sara Jennifer Eisenberg
Represented By: Yvonne Rosil Mere
Represented By: Matthew David Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Hannah Luke Edwards
Represented By: Laura Susan Trice
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Julia Blau Spiegel
Represented By: James Robyzad Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Kevin McAleenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenen
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Healthcare Network
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: America's Essential Hospitals
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Center for Law and Economic Justice
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northwest Health Law Advocates
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kentucky Equal Justice Center
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Pan-Ethnic Health Network
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.
Represented By: Frances Cheston Thacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fiscal Policy Institute
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public Health Law Watch
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Families USA
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boundless Immigration
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics, California
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Catalyst
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Latino Coalition for a Healthy California
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Florida Health Justice Project
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health Law Advocates, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Economic Progress Institute
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Child Care Law Center
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michigan Immigrant Rights Center
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kids Forward
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Federation of American Hospitals
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northeastern Universitys Center for Health Policy and Law
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Children's Hospital Association
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Treatment Action Group
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Nursing
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Immigrant Policy Center
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Action Marin
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health Care For All
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Catholic Health Association of the United States
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health in Justice Action Lab
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Korean Community Center of the East Bay
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Medical Association
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massachusetts Law Reform Institute
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York Immigration Coalition
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Welcome Project
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Cities of Los Angeles and Oakland, California; Harris County, Texas; and 26 Additional Cities, Counties, and Local Government Agencies
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Seattle, Washington
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Santa Monica, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Dallas, Texas
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHI
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of West Hollywood, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Monterey, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Stockton, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Minneapolis, Minnesota
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of King, Washington
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Baltimore, Maryland
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAZON
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Holyoke, Massachusetts
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Sacramento, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of San Mateo, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Council on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of South Bend, Indiana
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Chicago, Illinois
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Somerville, Massachusetts
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City and County of Denver, Colorado
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caring Across Generations
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Marin, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Detroit, Michigan
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Travis, Texas
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Albuquerque, New Mexico
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Santa Cruz, California
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Austin, Texas
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Houston, Texas
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deans, Chairs, and Scholars
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Harris, Texas
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?