Johnese v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Aaliyah Johnese
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv04797
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starbucks Corporation re Standing Order for Civil Cases Before District Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (Benton-Hayes, Chambord) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 19, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 12th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-04797-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/29/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Benton-Hayes, Chambord) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starbucks Corporation re Notice to Court and Adverse Parties of Removal of Action to the United States District Court (Benton-Hayes, Chambord) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starbucks Corporation re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Certificate of Service and Standing Orders and Procedures for Magistrate Judge Beeler (de Leon, Lara) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11 /7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starbucks Corporation re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (de Leon, Lara) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation under FRCP 7.1 (de Leon, Lara) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Starbucks Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, (de Leon, Lara) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-576847. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13611144). Filed byStarbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. sections 1332 and 1441, #2 Exhibit B to to Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. sections 1332 and 1441, #3 Exhibit C to Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. sections 1332 and 1441, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Declaration of Lara C. de Leon in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. sections 1332 and 1441, #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lara C. de Leon in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. sections 1332 and 1441, #7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lara C. de Leon in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. sections 1332 and 1441, #8 Declaration of Sarah Rogers in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. sections 1332 and 1441)(de Leon, Lara) (Filed on 8/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnese v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaliyah Johnese
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Lara Cardin de Leon
Represented By: Chambord V. Benton-Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?