State of California et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: District of Columbia, State of Maine, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Oregon and State of California
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary USDHS Kevin McAleenan
Petitioner: Community Healthcare Network, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Center for Public Representation, America's Essential Hospitals, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al., Fiscal Policy Institute, National Council on Independent Living, Public Health Law Watch, Families USA, Boundless Immigration, American Public Health Association, Little Lobbyists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, The Arc of the United States, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, American Hospital Association, Florida Health Justice Project, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Economic Progress Institute, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, Child Care Law Center, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Kids Forward, The Federation of American Hospitals, Community Catalyst, National Disability Rights Network, American College of Physicians, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, United Spinal Association, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, The Children's Hospital Association, Treatment Action Group, American Academy of Nursing, California Immigrant Policy Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Community Action Marin, American Association of People with Disabilities, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., American Academy of Pediatrics, Health Care For All, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Health in Justice Action Lab, American Civil Liberties Union, Disability Rights California, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Mental Health America, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, National Federation of the Blind, American Medical Association, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, New York Immigration Coalition and Welcome Project
Amicus Curiae: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD), Japanese American Citizens League (JACL), Women Lawyers on Guard Inc., EMBARC, Population Connection, Anti-Defamation League, Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism, Asian & Latino Solidarity Alliance of Central Virginia, Oasis Legal Services, Chinese for Affirmative Action, PHI, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center (SEARAC), Colorado Organization for Latina Opportunity and Reproductive Rights (COLOR), Apna Ghar, Inc., American Society on Aging, Services, Immigrant Rights & Education Network (SIREN), National Advocates for Pregnant Women, Women's Law Center of Maryland, Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations, National Partnership for Women & Families, Asian Pacific Development Center, Members of the Congressional Asian Pacific American Caucus, OneAmerica, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, In the Public Interest, National Council on Aging, In Our Own Voice: National Black Womens Reproductive Justice Agenda, KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum (NAPAWF), Center on Reproductive Rights and Justice at Berkeley School of Law, Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 58 other amici curiae, MAZON, Members of the Congressional Hispanic Caucus, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Asian American Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Asian Law Alliance, Equal Rights Advocates, National Hispanic Council on Aging, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, California Asian Pacific Islander Legislative Caucus, Disability Rights Advocates, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund (SALDEF), National Immigrant Women's Advocacy Project, OCA - Asian Pacific American Advocates, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Coalition on Human Needs, If When How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice, Caring Across Generations, Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States (SIECUS), Members of the Congressional Black Caucus, South Asian Americans Leading Together (SAALT), Oklahoma Call for Reproductive Justice, Asian Pacific American Legal Resource Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Justice in Aging, Women's Bar Association of the State of New York, National Immigrant Justice Center, Asian Pacific Community in Action, National Crittenton, National Coalition for Asian Pacific American Community Development (National CAPACD), MinKwon Center for Community Action, Chinese-American Planning Council, National Korean American Service & Education Consortium (NAKASEC), Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Reproductive Health Access Project, 9to5, National Association of Working Women, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Transgender Law Center, End Rape on Campus, Connecticut Women's Education and Legal Fund, Girls Inc., Deans, Chairs, and Scholars and Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs
Case Number: 4:2019cv04975
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 154 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2020 re #149 MOTION to Compel Completion of Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery filed by State of California. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 152 REPLY (re #149 MOTION to Compel Completion of Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery ) filed byCommonwealth of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Maine, State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Lisa Cisneros, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 56-72 of Supplemental Declaration of Lisa Cisneros, #3 Proposed Order Revised [Proposed] Order)(Mass, Julia) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER of USCA as to #129 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 151 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #149 MOTION to Compel Completion of Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery ) filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 150 ERRATA re #149 MOTION to Compel Completion of Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery Declaration of Lisa Cisneros by State of California. (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 149 MOTION to Compel Completion of Administrative Record and Request for Leave to Serve Discovery filed by State of California. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 2/12/2020. Replies due by 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Cisneros, #2 Exhibit 1-25, #3 Exhibit 26-55, #4 Proposed Order)(Mass, Julia) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton regarding Administrative Motions to Manually File Administrative Record.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 4:19-cv-04980-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 147 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Manually File Administrative Record filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Responses due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Kolsky Declaration), #2 Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER of USCA as to #129 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION RE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE; ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #144 Stipulation. Motions related to discovery and completeness of administrative record due by 1/29/2020. Response due 2/12/2020. Reply due 2/19/2020. Hearing set for 3/4/2020 at 9:00 a.m. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 144 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Case Management Schedule per minute entry #136 filed by State of California and U.S. Deparment of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, U.S Citizenship and Immigration Services, and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2019) Modified on 12/23/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/23/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #142 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-2 Requesting Order Changing Time filed by State of California, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 12/9/2019) Modified on 12/10/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton terminating (120) Motion to Stay in case 19-cv-04717-PJH and (125) Motion to Stay in case 19-cv-04975-PJH Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER of USCA as to #129 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 139 Statement of Recent Decisions pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d by State of California. (Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 138 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/14/19, before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (132 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2020. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 137 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Stay, #2 Corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Related document(s) #133 ) (Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2019. Parties shall submit stipulated proposed briefing schedule by 12/9/2019. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 135 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the hearing on #125 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction set for 12/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Waiver of Reply and Hearing by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security re #125 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2019 Filing 133 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #125 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction ) filed byState of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 132 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by State of California, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenen, and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 11/7/2019) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER of USCA as to #129 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 130 USCA Case Number 19-17214 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #129 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #120 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 128 Declaration of Daniel Renaud in Support of #125 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Related document(s) #125 ) (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No Title Page Re: #126 Declaration in Support, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizens hip and Immigration Services.Declarations e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 regarding first page requirement.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 127 Proposed Order re #125 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 126 Declaration of Daniel Renaud in Support of #125 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Related document(s) #125 ) (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/8/2019. Replies due by 11/15/2019. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #123 Joint Motion for Relief from Referral to ADR Multi-Option Program.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 123 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief from Automatic Referral to the ADR Multi-Option Program filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 10/24/2019) Modified on 10/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION to Withdraw #121 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. Responses due by 10/31/2019. Replies due by 11/7/2019. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Missing Proposed Order Re: #121 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .A proposed order required in accordance with L.R. 5-1(g). Please file a p roposed order ONLY and link it to the Motion. The event is: Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Order (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 121 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. Responses due by 10/30/2019. Replies due by 11/6/2019. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 120 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAssociated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 4:19-cv-04980-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by District of Columbia. Responses due by 10/24/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nannery, Valerie) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 118 ***DISREGARD, ENTERED INTO THIS CASE IN ERROR***MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by District of Columbia. Responses due by 10/24/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nannery, Valerie) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/11/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Draft Injunction by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/7/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Filing 115 Letter from Plaintiffs in All Related Cases . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 114 Supplemental Brief of Record Citations In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 113 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/02/19, before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (111 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 124 in 4:19-cv-04980-PJH, 108 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order, (110 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH) Transcript Order, (109 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Alacoque Hinga Nevitt (Nevitt, Alacoque) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/2/2019 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/2/2019 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton by State of California, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/2/2019. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Correction))(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 28, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Price Davis (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Davis, Ethan) (Filed on 9/28/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 106 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M Lehe (Lehe, Katherine) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 104 REPLY (re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #103 filed byState of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 103 ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY #104 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT*** REPLY (re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) filed by State of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Amended Declaration of Jennifer Van Hook by State of California re #18 Appendix (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer Van Hook, #2 Declaration Amended Declaration of Jennifer Van Hook)(Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 9/18/2019) Modified on 9/18/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI BRIEFS (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 14, 2019 Filing 100 Appendix to #99 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae the Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byBoundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by California Immigrant Policy Center, Oasis Legal Services, Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Economic Progress Institute, Community Action Marin, Child Care Law Center, Boundless Immigration, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, Kids Forward. Responses due by 9/30/2019. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany N. Lovejoy, #2 [Proposed] Brief of Amici Curiae, #3 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Krumplitsch, Susan) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Edward T. Waters. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Phillip A. Escoriaza. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher J. Frisina. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Emily Nash. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew London. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristyn DeFilipp. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christian Springer. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Cohen. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wendy Parmet. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sean Marotta. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, California Food Policy Advocates, California League of United Latin American Citizens, Center for the Study of Social Policy, Childrens Defense Fund-New York, Childrens HealthWatch, The Childrens Partnership, Citizens Committee for Children of New York, Comunidades Unidas, First Focus on Children, Kansas Appleseed Center for Law and Justice, Inc., Los Angeles Regional Food Bank, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Mississippi Center for Justice, National Law Center on Homelessness & Poverty, National Low Income Housing Coalition, National WIC Association, Oregon Food Bank, Prevention Institute, Sant La, Haitian Neighborhood Center, Inc., South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Utahns Against Hunger, Virginia Poverty Law Center. Responses due by 9/26/2019. Replies due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Thacher, Frances Cheston) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 85 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: South Asian Americans Leading Together (SAALT), Southeast Asia Resource Action Center (SEARAC), Transgender Law Center, Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism, Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs, Women's Bar Association of the State of New York, Women's Law Center of Maryland and Women Lawyers on Guard Inc.. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 84 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: Oasis Legal Services, OCA - Asian Pacific American Advocates, Oklahoma Call for Reproductive Justice, OneAmerica, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Population Connection, Reproductive Health Access Project, Services, Immigrant Rights & Education Network (SIREN), Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States (SIECUS) and Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund (SALDEF). (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 83 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: If When How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice, In Our Own Voice: National Black Womens Reproductive Justice Agenda, In the Public Interest, Japanese American Citizens League (JACL), KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, MinKwon Center for Community Action, National Advocates for Pregnant Women, National Korean American Service & Education Consortium (NAKASEC), National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum (NAPAWF), National Coalition for Asian Pacific American Community Development (National CAPACD), National Crittenton, National Immigrant Justice Center, National Immigrant Women's Advocacy Project and National Partnership for Women & Families. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 82 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: California Asian Pacific Islander Legislative Caucus, Center on Reproductive Rights and Justice at Berkeley School of Law, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Chinese-American Planning Council, Chinese for Affirmative Action, Coalition on Human Needs, Colorado Organization for Latina Opportunity and Reproductive Rights (COLOR), Connecticut Women's Education and Legal Fund, EMBARC, End Rape on Campus, Equal Rights Advocates, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Girls Inc. and GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD). (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: Asian Pacific Development Center, Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations, 9to5, National Association of Working Women, Anti-Defamation League, Apna Ghar, Inc., Asian American Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Asian & Latino Solidarity Alliance of Central Virginia, Asian Law Alliance, Asian Pacific American Legal Resource Center, Asian Pacific Community in Action, Asian Pacific Development Center and Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans - Ayman El-Mohandes, MBBCh, MD, MPH, Barbara K. Rimer, DrPH, MPH, Boris Lushniak, MD, MPH, David B. Allison, PhD, Edith A. Parker, MPH, DrPH, G. Thomas Chandler, MS, PhD, Hilary Godwin, PhD, Karen Drenkard, PhD, RN, NEA-BC, FAAN, Laura A. Siminoff, PhD, Linda P. Fried, MD, MPH, Lynn R. Goldman, MD, MPH, MS, Mark A. Schuster, MD, PhD, Michael C. Lu, MD, MS, MPH, Pamela R. Jeffries, PhD, RN, FAAN, ANEF, FSSH, Paula Lantz, PhD, Sandro Galea, MD, DrPH, Sherry Glied, PhD, MA, Sten H. Vermund, MD, PhD, Thomas E. Burroughs, PhD, MS, MA; Chairs - Alan G. Wasserman, MD, MACP, Becky Slifkin, PhD, Claire D. Brindis, DrPH, David M. Keepnews, PhD, JD, RN, NEA-BC, FAAN, Jane Thorpe, JD, Karen A. McDonnell, PhD; Scholars - Alan B. Cohen, Sc.D., Allison K. Hoffman, JD, Amita N. Vyas, PhD, MHS, Andy Schneider, JD, Benjamin D. Sommers, MD, PhD, Colleen M. Grogan, PhD, Daniel Skinner, PhD, David M. Frankford, JD, David Michaels, PhD, MPH, Diana J. Mason, RN, PhD, FAAN, Dora L. Hughes, MD, MPH, Harold Pollark, PhD, Janet Heinrich, DrPH, RN, FAAN, Jeffrey Levi, PhD, Jillian Catalanotti, MD, MPH, FACP, Joan Alker, Jonathan Oberlander, PhD, Julia Zoe Beckerman, JD, MPH, Katherine Horton, RN, MPH, JD, Katherine Swartz, PhD, Krista M. Perreira, PhD, Lynn A. Blewett, PhD, MA, Mark A. Peterson, PhD, Maureen Byrnes, MPA, Melissa M. Goldstein, JD, Michael K. Gusmano, PhD, Naomi Seiler, JD, Neal Halfon, MD, MPH, Nicole Huberfeld, JD, Pam Silberman, JD, DrPH, Rand E. Rosenblatt, JD, Sara Rosenbaum, JD, Sylvia A. Law, JD, Timothy Stoltzfus Jost, JD, Timothy M. Westmoreland, JD, Wendy K. Mariner, JD, LLM, MPH, William B. Borden, MD, FACC, FAHA. Responses due by 9/26/2019. Replies due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars (Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Edward T. Waters ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687118.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/9/2019 filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Phillip A. Escoriaza ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687099.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/9/2019 filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Escoriaza, Phillip) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Christopher J. Frisina ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687023.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/9/2019 filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Frisina for Kathryn E. Doi (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITATION APPLICABLE TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #62 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Emily Nash ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696656.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Nash, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Andrew London ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696641.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (London, Andrew) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 71 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, American Association of People with Disabilities, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Disability Rights California, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association. Responses due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah M. Ray, #2 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #3 Proposed Order)(Ray, Sarah) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Health Law Advocates, Inc. and 23 Other Organizations Interested in Public Health in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kristyn DeFilipp ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696272.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (DeFilipp, Kristyn) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Christian Springer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696213.) filed by Health Law Advocates, Inc.. (Springer, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Cohen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695367.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Wendy Parmet ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695329.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Sean Marotta ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695201.) filed by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, The Children's Hospital Association, The Federation of American Hospitals. (Marotta, Sean) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Hospital Association, America's Essential Hospitals, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, The Children's Hospital Association, The Federation of American Hospitals. Responses due by 9/25/2019. Replies due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Amici Curiae Brief, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Gonzales, Michelle) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Jonathan Lowe (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Extension of Page Limits filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and the State of Califnoria(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Dermody (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI BRIEFS. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Members of the Congressional Black Caucus CBC (Rep. Karen Bass, Rep. Yvette D. Clarke, Rep. Emanuel Cleaver, Rep. Bonnie Watson Coleman, Rep. Danny K. Davis, Rep. Val Demings, Rep. Steven Horsford, Rep. Henry C. Hank Johnson, Jr., Rep. Eleanor Holmes Norton, Rep. Lisa Blunt Rochester, Rep. Robert C. Bobby Scott, Rep. Bennie Thompson) Members of the Congressional Hispanic Caucus - CHC (Rep. Nanette Diaz Barragn, Rep. Salud O. Carbajal, Rep. Joaquin Castro, Rep. J. Luis Correa, Rep. Veronica Escobar, Rep. Adriano Espaillat, Rep. Ruben Gallego, Rep. Jess G. Chuy Garca, Rep. Jimmy Gomez, Rep. Sylvia R. Garcia, Rep. Ral M. Grijalva, Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell, Rep. Grace F. Napolitano, Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez, Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard, Rep. Gregorio Kilili Camacho Sablan, Rep. Linda T. Snchez, Rep. Jos E. Serrano, Rep. Albio Sires, Rep. Darren Soto, Rep. Norma J. Torres, Rep. Juan Vargas, Rep. Nydia M. Velzquez), Members of the Congressional Asian Pacific American Caucus - CAPAC (Rep. Judy Chu, Rep. Bonnie Watson Coleman, Rep. TJ Cox, Rep. Anna G. Eshoo, Rep. Al Green, Rep. Deb Haaland, Rep. Pramila Jayapal, Rep. Barbara Lee, Rep. Ted W. Lieu, Rep. Grace Meng, Rep. Grace F. Napolitano, Rep. Gregorio Kilili Camacho Sablan, Rep. Mark Takano, Rep. Juan Vargas, Rep. Linda T. Sanchez, Rep. Nydia M. Velzquez). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Reider, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 58 other amici curiae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Law of Amici Curiae Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 58 other amici ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order)(Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 56 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Austin Joan Sutta on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 58 other amici curiae. (Sutta, Austin) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 55 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Christopher Cadena on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 58 other amici curiae. (Cadena, Christopher) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 54 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Emily Tomoko Kuwahara on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 58 other amici curiae. (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Natalie Kean. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Regan Bailey. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Denny Chan. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Owen T. Masters. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Russell L. Hirshhorn. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Assi, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Kean ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687676.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Kean, Natalie) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Regan Bailey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687524.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Bailey, Regan) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Denny Chan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687329.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Chan, Denny) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Owen Masters ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687036.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Masters, Owen) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Russell Hirschhorn ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13686855.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Hirschhorn, Russell) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Maria Assi (Assi, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 41 Refund Status re #35 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Opposition due by 9/13/2019. Reply due by 9/20/2019. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE.(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Order Setting Briefing Schedule) filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, La Clinica De La Raza, California Primary Care Association, Maternal and Child Health Access, Farmworker Justice, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Central American Resource Center, Korean Resource Center, Commonwelath of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, Stae of California, State of Maine, State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Michael Kolsky (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Harumi Mass (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF STATES' ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITS FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #19 Administrative Motion. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 35 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26JPGHUO for Pro Hac Vice Application Fee by State of Oregon. (DeFever, Jeanne) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (DeFever, Jeanne) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Support of Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by La Clinica De La Raza, California Primary Care Association, Maternal and Child Health Access, Farmworker Justice, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Central American Resource Center, Korean Resource Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship, #2 Exhibit Order Directing Parties to File Response, #3 Exhibit As filed Response iso Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determ Relationship of Cases)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/29/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Cherokee Dawn-Marie Melton for Plaintiff State of California (Melton, Cherokee) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by State of California re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. First page requires case number regarding #26 Certificate of Service filed by State of California. Please review Local Rule 3-4 for first page require ments. The document does not been to be refiled, but counsel should comply for all future filings. No further action is necessary. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Susan P. Herman. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Aimee Diane Thomson. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #1 Complaint (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Michael Kron ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13653724.) filed by State of Oregon. (DeFever, Jeanne) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case C-19-4975 is related to case C-19-4717-PJH. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/27/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of California.. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/10/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. ((ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Lisa Cisneros in Support of #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion to Exceed Applicable Page Limits re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. Responses due by 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 Appendix re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Van Hook, Declaration of Ninez Ponce, Declaration of Laurel Lucia, and Declaration of Tom K. Wong, #2 Declaration Declarations of Sarah Neville-Morgan, Susan Fanelli, Charity Dean, Doug McKeever, Kevin Kish, Mari Cantwell, Alexis Carmen Fernandez, Debbi Thomson, M. Marcela Ruiz, Sasha R. Kergan, Jennifer Hernandez, John D. Stobo, #3 Declaration Declarations of Wilma Chan, Colleen Chawla, Carmela Coyle, David H. Aizuss, Antonia Jimenez, Barbara Ferrer, Pia Escudero, Lori Medina, Gary Gray, and Jodi Hicks, #4 Declaration Declarations of Cathy Buhrig, Colt Gill, Fariborz Pakseresht, Margaret Solle Salazar, Patrick Allen, Michelle Probert, Anthony Pelotte, Mila Kofman, Melisa Byrd, and Lindsey Palmer)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/9/2019. Replies due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William Hawthorne Downer (Downer, William) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13629711.) filed by State of Maine. (Herman, Susan) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Nicole DeFever on behalf of State of Oregon (DeFever, Jeanne) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Janine Cisneros FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda Ayon Verduzco (Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13624677.) filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Thomson, Aimee) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kevin McAleenan. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Maria Nannery (Nannery, Valerie) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by State of California . (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13617881.). Filed byState of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 8/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Valerie Maria Nannery
Represented By: Alacoque Hinga Nevitt
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Susan P. Herman
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Aimee Diane Thomson
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Jeanne Nicole DeFever
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Anna Margaret Rich
Represented By: Cherokee Dawn-Marie Melton
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Katherine M Lehe
Represented By: Lisa Janine Cisneros
Represented By: Brenda Ayon Verduzco
Represented By: William Hawthorne Downer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary USDHS Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Japanese American Citizens League (JACL)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women Lawyers on Guard Inc.
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMBARC
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Population Connection
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian & Latino Solidarity Alliance of Central Virginia
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chinese for Affirmative Action
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHI
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southeast Asia Resource Action Center (SEARAC)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado Organization for Latina Opportunity and Reproductive Rights (COLOR)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Apna Ghar, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Services, Immigrant Rights & Education Network (SIREN)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Advocates for Pregnant Women
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Law Center of Maryland
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Partnership for Women & Families
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific Development Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of the Congressional Asian Pacific American Caucus
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OneAmerica
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: In the Public Interest
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: In Our Own Voice: National Black Womens Reproductive Justice Agenda
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum (NAPAWF)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center on Reproductive Rights and Justice at Berkeley School of Law
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 58 other amici curiae
Represented By: Christopher Cadena
Represented By: Austin Joan Sutta
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAZON
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of the Congressional Hispanic Caucus
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian American Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Law Alliance
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Equal Rights Advocates
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Council on Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LatinoJustice PRLDEF
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Asian Pacific Islander Legislative Caucus
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disability Rights Advocates
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund (SALDEF)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Immigrant Women's Advocacy Project
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OCA - Asian Pacific American Advocates
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Planned Parenthood Federation of America
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition on Human Needs
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: If When How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caring Across Generations
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States (SIECUS)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of the Congressional Black Caucus
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Asian Americans Leading Together (SAALT)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oklahoma Call for Reproductive Justice
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific American Legal Resource Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Aging
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Bar Association of the State of New York
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Immigrant Justice Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific Community in Action
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Crittenton
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Coalition for Asian Pacific American Community Development (National CAPACD)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MinKwon Center for Community Action
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chinese-American Planning Council
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Korean American Service & Education Consortium (NAKASEC)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reproductive Health Access Project
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 9to5, National Association of Working Women
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Transgender Law Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: End Rape on Campus
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Connecticut Women's Education and Legal Fund
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Girls Inc.
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deans, Chairs, and Scholars
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Healthcare Network
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Center for Public Representation
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: America's Essential Hospitals
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Center for Law and Economic Justice
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northwest Health Law Advocates
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kentucky Equal Justice Center
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Pan-Ethnic Health Network
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Association of University Centers on Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.
Represented By: Frances Cheston Thacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fiscal Policy Institute
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Council on Independent Living
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public Health Law Watch
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Families USA
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boundless Immigration
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Little Lobbyists
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Arc of the United States
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics, California
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Latino Coalition for a Healthy California
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Florida Health Justice Project
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michigan Immigrant Rights Center
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Economic Progress Institute
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Child Care Law Center
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health Law Advocates, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Autistic Self Advocacy Network
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kids Forward
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Federation of American Hospitals
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Catalyst
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Disability Rights Network
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United Spinal Association
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Children's Hospital Association
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Treatment Action Group
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Nursing
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Immigrant Policy Center
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Action Marin
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Association of People with Disabilities
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health Care For All
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Catholic Health Association of the United States
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health in Justice Action Lab
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Disability Rights California
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mental Health America
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Korean Community Center of the East Bay
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Sarah Meyers Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Medical Association
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massachusetts Law Reform Institute
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York Immigration Coalition
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Welcome Project
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?