District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Usal Painting, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Jeannie Simpelo, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen and Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Alexander E. Navarro and Usal Painting, LLC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05071
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Jeannie Simpelo. Alexander E. Navarro served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; Usal Painting, LLC. served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 19, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 12, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-05071-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/23/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Jeannie Simpelo.. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Usal Painting, LLC, Alexander E. Navarro,. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Jeannie Simpelo re #1 Complaint,, (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander E. Navarro, Usal Painting, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13621116.). Filed byDistrict Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Jeannie Simpelo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 8/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Usal Painting, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Simpelo
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander E. Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Usal Painting, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?