Zehrer v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Terrence Zehrer
Defendant: Arthur D. Levinson, Craig Federighi, Ronald D. Sugar, Apple Inc., Luca Maestri, Timothy D. Cook, Andrea Jung, James A. Bell, Susan L. Wagner, Robert A. Iger and Albert Gore, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05153
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND VACATING DATES. In light of the Stay [Dkt. no. 11], all pending dates are VACATED. Further, a Compliance hearing shall be held on Friday 3/13/2020 at 9:01 AM. Joint Statement containing a proposed case management schedule or the advisability of a continuing stay to be filed by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/2/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Ray Wedeking, II (Wedeking, Steven) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Wallace Smith (Smith, Craig) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Rawlins Rifkin (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-2033-YGR and 5:19-cv-5153-EJD. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/27/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Granting #7 Stipulation to Stay Case until 3/12/2020 Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/12/2020.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides for Nominal Defendant Apple Inc. (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer for Nominal Defendant Apple Inc. (Kramer, James) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Haag for Nominal Defendant Apple Inc. (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STAYING ACTION filed by Terrence Zehrer. (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc., James A. Bell, Timothy D. Cook, Craig Federighi, Albert Gore, Jr, Robert A. Iger, Andrea Jung, Arthur D. Levinson, Luca Maestri, Ronald D. Sugar, Susan L. Wagner. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Terrence Zehrer (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., James A. Bell, Timothy D. Cook, Craig Federighi, Albert Gore, Jr, Robert A. Iger, Andrea Jung, Arthur D. Levinson, Luca Maestri, Ronald D. Sugar, Susan L. Wagner ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13624528.). Filed byTerrence Zehrer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 8/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zehrer v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur D. Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Federighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luca Maestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Iger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Gore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Zehrer
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Craig Wallace Smith
Represented By: Steven Ray Wedeking, II
Represented By: Ashley Rawlins Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?