Apostol v. John or Jane Doe, et al
Plaintiff: Magdalena Apostol and Magdalena Apostolova
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 20, Jane Doe, John Doe, Safeco Insurance Co of America, Safeco Insurance Co. Of America and John or Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2019cv05172
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: In light of the temporary stay #12 , the telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/20/19 is CONTINUED to 3/25/2020 02:30 PM. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due by 3/18/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION #11 by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Action Pending Arbitration filed by Safeco Insurance Co. Of America and Magdalena Apostol. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2019) Modified on 9/9/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2019 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/21/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/21/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/20/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Part 2 Page 2(Notice of Removal) bySafeco Insurance Co. Of America. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Parties Entered Incorrectly. (aaaS, COUR T STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Safeco Insurance Co of America. (Lau, Norman) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Safeco Insurance Co of America identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation for Safeco Insurance Co of America. (Lau, Norman) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Norman Lau in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed bySafeco Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Lau, Norman) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; (NO PROCESS); from The Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is C19-00424. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13626431). Filed bySafeco Insurance Co of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lau, Norman) (Filed on 8/19/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apostol v. John or Jane Doe, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Co of America
Represented By: Norman Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Co. Of America
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos
Represented By: Norman Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Apostol
Represented By: George S Wynns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Apostolova
Represented By: George S Wynns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?