Ferguson v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Plaintiff: Rollington Ferguson
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv05262
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:2651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rollington Ferguson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #6 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING THE DEADLINE TO FILE A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATMENT.The correct date for a Case Management Conference Statement to be filed is Monday, 11/25/2019. This notice corrects the text of the entry in Dkt. No. 9.The 10/28/19 filing deadline is VACATED. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by ** 11/25/2019** The 10/28/2019 filing deadline is vacated.** Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 12/2/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (fs, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Rollington Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rollington Ferguson.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 08/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order All Judges)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #44611016476.) Filed byRollington Ferguson. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rollington Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?