Wilgenbusch et al v. Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation
Plaintiff: Judith A. Wilgenbusch and Ronald C. Wilgenbusch
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation, Darcoid Company of California, Lockheed Shipbuilding Company, SB Decking, Inc., FMC Corporation individually and on behalf of its former Stearns business, Goulds Pumps LLC, Crane Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company, American Biltrite, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., General Electric Company, Campbell Industries, FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, York International Corporation, IMO Industries Inc., Astra Flooring Company, Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,, FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Fryer-Knowles, Inc. a California corporation, Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Flowserve U.S. Inc., Lone Star Industries, Inc., MetalClad Insulation LLC, Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. and Domco Products Texas, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05620
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 109 Letter from David Rancilio Regarding Mr. Wilgenbusch's Deposition and Meet and Confer for Rule 26(f). (Rancilio, David) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 108 Letter from David Rancilio Scheduling Meet and Confer Regarding a Discovery Plan Pursuant to Rule 26(f). (Rancilio, David) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 107 REPLY (re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byLockheed Shipbuilding Company. (Clark, Brian) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 106 Certificate of Interested Entities by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., identifying Other Affiliate London Market Companies, Other Affiliate American Employers, Other Affiliate Affiliated FM, Other Affiliate Lloyds' Underwriters, Other Affiliate Allstate for SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,. re Electronic Filing Error,, (Whitehead, Henry) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents (e.g. American Employers, Affiliated FM, Allstate, London Market Companies and Lloyds' Underwriters). This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #103 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 105 REPLY BRIEF (re #77 Ex Parte Application for Sua Sponte Order Remanding Action) filed by Judith A. Wilgenbusch, Ronald C. Wilgenbusch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Uchimura, Marissa) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., (Whitehead, Henry) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 103 Certificate of Interested Entities by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., (Whitehead, Henry) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS for SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,. (Whitehead, Henry) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Louis Whitehead (Whitehead, Henry) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 100 ERRATA re #77 Ex Parte Application FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judith A. Wilgenbusch, Ronald C. Wilgenbusch. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Uchimura, Marissa) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Errata. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > E rrata. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #94 Ex Parte Application re #77 Ex Parte Application FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION, 78 Order, Notice of Errata to the Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Ronald C. Wilgenbusch, Judith A. Wilgenbusch (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen FOR DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION for FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION. and Rockwell Manufacturing Co. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 96 Certificate of Interested Entities by FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION for FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 94 Ex Parte Application re #77 Ex Parte Application FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION, 78 Order, Notice of Errata to the Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Judith A. Wilgenbusch, Ronald C. Wilgenbusch. (Uchimura, Marissa) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company. (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/28/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Kelly (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/28/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rockwell Automation, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nationwide Indemnity Company for Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 88 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Lockheed Shipbuilding Company's Motion to Dismiss filed byJudith A. Wilgenbusch, Ronald C. Wilgenbusch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Amell in Opposition to Defendant Lockheed Shipbuilding Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Plaintiff Ronald Wilgenbusch by Judith A. Wilgenbusch, Ronald C. Wilgenbusch (Amell, David) (Filed on 10/21/2019) Modified on 10/22/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2019 Filing 86 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #77 Ex Parte Application FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION ) filed byFryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by MetalClad Insulation LLC identifying Other Affiliate Transport Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ENTRX LLC (Holding Company), Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group) for MetalClad Insulation LLC. (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Christian Jackson for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Elisabet Gage (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Initial Disclosure by Campbell Industries (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Jocelyn Mislang Soriano for Campbell Industries (Soriano, Jocelyn) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lockheed Shipbuilding Company identifying Corporate Parent Lockheed Martin Corporation for Lockheed Shipbuilding Company. (Clark, Brian) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lockheed Shipbuilding Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/23/2019. Replies due by 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Dana L. Bennett, #4 Proposed Order)(Clark, Brian) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #77 Ex Parte Application FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION. Responses due by 10/21/2019. Replies due by 10/28/2019. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER The Court considers the motion to remand [ECF No. 77] as a regularly noticed motion. The opposition is due October 28, 2019, and the reply is due October 21, 2019. The hearing is scheduled for November 20, 2019 at 2 p.m.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 4, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 77 Ex Parte Application FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION filed by Judith A. Wilgenbusch, Ronald C. Wilgenbusch. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARISSA Y. UCHIMURA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION, #3 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN SUPPORT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION, #4 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) SIGNATURE PAGES EXECUTED BY MARISSA Y. UCHIMURA OF PLAINTIFFS PLEADINGS FILED AND SERVED HEREWITH, #5 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION, #6 PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS, #7 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Uchimura, Marissa) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Fryer-Knowles, Inc. a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc., a California corporations Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium; Demand for Jury Trial)(Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 10/3/2019) Modified on 10/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2019 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fryer-Knowles, Inc. a California corporation (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Stewart Bishop on behalf of Fryer-Knowles, Inc., a California corporation (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Astra Flooring Company identifying Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate St. Paul Travelers, Other Affiliate Resolute Management, Inc., Other Affiliate RiverStone Claims Management LLC, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group, Other Affiliate The Hartford for Astra Flooring Company. re Electronic Filing Error, (Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #69 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Astra Flooring Company (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 72 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Biltrite, Inc. (Adams, Abigail) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Perry Adams and Brent Karren (Adams, Abigail) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAstra Flooring Company. (Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 69 Certificate of Interested Entities by Astra Flooring Company (Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger on behalf of Astra Flooring Company (Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch on behalf of Astra Flooring Company (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Astra Flooring Company (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Tarkoff and Jennifer Cormier (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc., The, Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 63 Notice of Re-filing ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byThe Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 62 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #61***NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Michael Ridley (Ridley, Shawn) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 54 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc.. (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane B Yee (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc. Notice of Filing State Court Answer (Yee, Jane) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE by Ingersoll-Rand Company Of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo for Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner for Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon for Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Refiling State Court Answer by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson for Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SB Decking, Inc. (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Florence Anne McClain (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate The Employer's Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Crane Co.. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 39 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crane Co. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Edward Soskin and Geoffrey M. Davis (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury; Jury Demand byCrane Co.. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by FMC Corporation individually and on behalf of its former Stearns business (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa Kacy Gittler (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial by FMC Corporation individually and on behalf of its former Stearns business (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2019 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sid Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages by Sid Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2019 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling, LLC for IMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 9/15/2019)
September 15, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey , Frederick W. Gatt and Olga G. Pena (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 9/15/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byIMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance OF COUNSEL FOR YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION by Marisa Renee Chaves (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF DEFENDANT YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by York International Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps LLC GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT LLC for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR GOULDS PUMPS LLC (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by Goulds Pumps LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hill Brothers Chemical Company HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY by Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation. (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Keith Bernard and Christine L. Hawkins for Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., a Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Debtor (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., a Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Debtor's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Prayer for Relief byTriple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Bernard, Randall) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Notice of Removal, and have been added to this case: SB Decking, Inc., Lone Star Industries, Inc., Campbell Industries, Darcoid Company of California, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc., York International Corporation, Sid Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., American Biltrite, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, MetalClad Insulation LLC, General Electric Company, Lockheed Shipbuilding Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc. and Flowserve U.S. Inc., Flowserve U.S. Inc., General Electric Company, Darcoid Company of California, Lockheed Shipbuilding Company, American Biltrite, Inc., Domco Products Texas, Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Campbell Industries, Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, SB Decking, Inc., MetalClad Insulation LLC, Sid Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Lone Star Industries, Inc., York International Corporation and Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (This is a text-only entry.) (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Standing Orders for District Judge Jon S. Tigar (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Standing Orders for Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation for Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation.. (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Glezakos (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation . (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19029791. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13681296). Filed byFryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 9/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilgenbusch et al v. Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Wilgenbusch
Represented By: David Lewis Rancilio,
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Marissa Y Uchimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Wilgenbusch
Represented By: David Lewis Rancilio,
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Marissa Y Uchimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles, Inc., A Washington Corporation
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcoid Company of California
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Brian Thomas Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Florence Anne McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation individually and on behalf of its former Stearns business
Represented By: Marissa Kacy Gittler
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Biltrite, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Abigail Perry Adams
Represented By: Brent Marshall Karren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Industries
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Jocelyn Mislang Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Represented By: Thomas J. Tarkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Flooring Company
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation sii to Cutler-Hammer Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Shawn Michael Ridley
Represented By: Jane B Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.,
Represented By: Henry Louis Whitehead
Represented By: Charlie Nelson Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor-in-interest to Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles, Inc. a California corporation
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Randall Keith Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetalClad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Michelle Christian Jackson
Represented By: Kathy Mai Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?