Svedise et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Svedise and Christopher Svedise
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv05680
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from District of Arizona, Case No. 2:16-cv-844-DGC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-00844. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 9/11/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #5 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ)
March 30, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Svedise, Darlene Svedise. Document entered in wrong case. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case, 2:15-md-2641-DGC. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP)
March 30, 2016 Filing 3 *AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher Svedise, Darlene Svedise.(Stoller, Paul) *Document filed in wrong case. Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1. Attorney noticed to re-file document in correct case on 3/30/2016 (LSP).
March 28, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-844-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP)
March 28, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12788651 filed by Christopher Svedise, Darlene Svedise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Svedise et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Svedise
Represented By: Robert W. Boatman
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Mark Stephen O'Connor
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Svedise
Represented By: Robert W. Boatman
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Mark Stephen O'Connor
Represented By: Ramon Rossi Lopez
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?