Wilson v. Tom-Liu Family Investments LLC
Plaintiff: A Marie Wilson
Defendant: Tom-Liu Family Investments LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv05698
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #8 Order,, Order Reassigning Case,, Report and Recommendations,, Terminate Motions,, ***Civil Case Terminated.Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 25, 2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/25/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to a district judge, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to grant #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by A Marie Wilson. Objections due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/7/2019. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A Marie Wilson.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #1 Envelope) (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Dismissal of Injunction filed by A Marie Wilson. Responses due by 10/3/2019. Replies due by 10/10/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support For Request to File Injunction by A Marie Wilson. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #1 Corrected PDF of Main Document) (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by A Marie Wilson. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against Tom-Liu Family Investments LLC. Filed by A Marie Wilson. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Tom-Liu Family Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom-Liu Family Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Marie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?