Robbins v. Checkr, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael J. Robbins
Defendant: Checkr, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05717
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/15/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by the Clerk on 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Checkr Inc. on 10/07/19 by Michael J. Robbins. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael J. Robbins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) Modified on 10/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael J. Robbins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Re-Mailed #3 Clerk's Notice to Corrected Address with Apartment Number. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Mail sent to Michael J. Robbins returned as undeliverable re #3 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
September 30, 2019 Remailed Conformed copies and initial case Opening document to Plaintiff. Requested the filing of document updating address with Apartment number 64. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Mail sent to Michael J. Robbins returned as undeliverable Re: Conformed copies and initial case opening documents. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Checkr, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt 34611144631) (No process). Filed by Michael J. Robbins. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Checkr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Checkr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?