Layhee v. Fratila
Plaintiff: Darcie Layhee
Defendant: Bogdan-Cristian Fratila
Case Number: 4:2019cv05756
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY (re #9 First MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court ) filed byDarcie Layhee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Smith, Michael) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Taylor J. Pohle in Support of #12 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byBogdan-Cristian Fratila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Pohle, Taylor) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 First MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court ) filed byBogdan-Cristian Fratila. (Pohle, Taylor) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 Renotice motion hearing re #9 First MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court filed byDarcie Layhee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice, not re-file, the Motion to Remand #9 . The hearing date of 11/7/2019 is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to comply with L.R. 7. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court filed by Darcie Layhee. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 10/25/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Smith, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bogdan-Cristian Fratila.. (Ranucci, John) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Darcie Layhee.. (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bogdan-Cristian Fratila re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration in Support, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #3 Declaration in Support (Pohle, Taylor) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint by Bogdan-Cristian Fratila. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Bogdan-Cristian Fratila in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byBogdan-Cristian Fratila. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Pohle, Taylor) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Taylor J. Pohle in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byBogdan-Cristian Fratila. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Pohle, Taylor) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-575080. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13702908). Filed byBogdan-Cristian Fratila. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pohle, Taylor) (Filed on 9/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layhee v. Fratila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcie Layhee
Represented By: Michael Scott Smith
Represented By: James Joseph Romag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogdan-Cristian Fratila
Represented By: Taylor Joseph Pohle
Represented By: Sheena Patel
Represented By: John W. Ranucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?