Orellana v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Blanca Estela Orellana and Blanca Estella Orellana
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, John Kramar and Kenneth T. Cuccineli
Case Number: 4:2019cv05759
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Stipulation #9 to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/1/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Filing of First Amended Complaint (Seeking Review on the Merits of Naturalization Decision) filed by Blanca Estella Orellana, Kevin K. McAleenan, John Kramar, Kenneth T. Cuccineli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Evidentiary Record)(Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 10/31/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blanca Estella Orellana (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent/Declination, Standings Orders, Procedural Order for Immigration/Mandamus Cases) on all Defendants (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanca Estella Orellana. All Defendants. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccineli, John Kramar, Kevin K. McAleenan. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Blanca Estela Orellana.. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus to Compel Decision on Naturalization Administrative Appeal against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13703092.). Filed byBlanca Estela Orellana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 9/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orellana v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Estela Orellana
Represented By: Kevin Michael Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Estella Orellana
Represented By: Kevin Michael Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccineli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?