Bennett, D.D.S. v. Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mark Bennett, D.D.S.
Defendant: Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation and Mitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05774
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE: The court has received the motion to remand #9 and motion to dismiss #14 and finds that the matters are appropriate for resolution without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the 11/14/2019 hearing on the motions is hereby VACATED. The court will issue a written order on the motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #23 Defendant Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation's Request for Permission to Attend Telephonically at the hearings on motions on 11/14/2019 01:00 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear by Telephone -- Defendant Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation's Request for Permission to Attend Telephonically the Hearings on Motions filed by Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Misty) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) Defendant Mitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed byMitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Shepherd, Michael) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMark Bennett, D.D.S.. (Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byMark Bennett, D.D.S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Mitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc. of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Shepherd, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Remand ) filed byOhio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration)(Murray, Misty) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terrence J. Coleman for Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP, Attorneys for Plaintiff, Mark Bennett, D.D.S. (Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc... (Shepherd, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT MITCHELL & MITCHELL INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Mitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/15/2019. Replies due by 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Delcaration of Counsel In Support of Mx to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Mx to Dismiss)(Catalanotti, Peter) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Bennett, D.D.S... (Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Bennett, D.D.S. re #9 MOTION to Remand (Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation.. (Murray, Misty) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Mark Bennett, D.D.S.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/10/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #8 Declaration of Mark Bennett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mark Bennett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #10 Exhibit B to Declaration of Mark Bennett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #11 Exhibit C to Declaration of Mark Bennett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #12 Exhibit D to Declaration of Mark Bennett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #13 Exhibit E to Declaration of Mark Bennett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #14 Exhibit F to Declaration of Mark Bennett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #15 Proposed Order, #16 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court New Case Documents and Standing Orders by Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation (Murray, Misty) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mark Bennett, D.D.S.. (Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Answer filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation on August 13, 2019 in Superior Court of California, County of Marin. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation -- Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Murray, Misty) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Ohio National Life Insurance Company for Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation. (Murray, Misty) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation (Murray, Misty) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 1903075 (no process). (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13704304). Filed by Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Removal, #2 Declaration of Heibert, #3 Exhibits B through E, #4 Declaration of Murray, #5 Exhibits F and G, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, Misty) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett, D.D.S. v. Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Natonal Life Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Misty Ann Murray
Represented By: Martin Elliot Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell & Mitchell Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Christopher Catalanotti
Represented By: Michael Vinton Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bennett, D.D.S.
Represented By: Ryan Hideki Opgenorth
Represented By: Terrence J. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?