Balistreri v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Plaintiff: Gaetano Balistreri
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 inclusive and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 4:2019cv05779
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gaetano Balistreri.. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank.. (Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank re #1 Notice of Removal, of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) (Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank re #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Declaration in Support, #5 Certificate of Interested Entities (Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12 /10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank re #1 Notice of Removal, (Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank re #1 Notice of Removal, (Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Diana Brandenburg in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byWells Fargo Bank. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Jill A. Porcaro in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byWells Fargo Bank. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Francisco. Their case number is 19-577786. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13704770). Filed byWells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porcaro, Jill) (Filed on 9/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balistreri v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Jill Ann Porcaro
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Devaux
Represented By: Christian Joseph Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaetano Balistreri
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: John Glugoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?