Yang v. Lifetech Resources LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Yang
Defendant: Lifetech Resources LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv05811
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2019. FTR Time: 2:31-2:36. Plaintiff Attorney: L. Timothy Fisher and Blair Reed. Defendant Attorney: Stephen Smerek. Matter is continued to March 12, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. for a further case management conference to be held along with the pending motions. A joint case management conference that includes a case schedule through class certification is due March 5, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lifetech Resources LLC Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosures (Smerek, Stephen) (Filed on 12/17/2019) Modified on 12/18/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Dismiss #1 Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim, and/or to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Lifetech Resources LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. Responses due by 1/23/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen R. Smerek, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephen R. Smerek, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Stephen R. Smerek, #4 Proposed Order on Defendant Lifetech Resources LLC's Motion)(Smerek, Stephen) (Filed on 12/17/2019) Modified on 12/18/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kimberly Yang and Lifetech Resources LLC. (Reed, Blair) (Filed on 12/10/2019) Modified on 12/10/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Reed, Blair) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 STIPULATION to Extend Time and Set Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 12/16/2019; Responses due by 1/23/2020; Replies due by 2/20/2020; and Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Kimberly Yang and Liftech Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, L) (Filed on 11/12/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearing, See Docket No. #12 : Motions due by 11/15/2019; Responses due by 12/20/2019; Replies due by 1/17/2020 and Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Time and Set Briefing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Yang. Lifetech Resources LLC served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Kimberly Yang and Lifetech Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for December 17, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by December 10, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-05811-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/219. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kimberly Yang.. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lifetech Resources LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lifetech Resources LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13712526.). Filed by Kimberly Yang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Lifetech Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifetech Resources LLC
Represented By: Stephen R. Smerek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Yang
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: L Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Scott Bursor
Represented By: Blair E. Reed
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?