Mosely et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wayne L. Bullard, Yolanda Alicea, Jason Devore, Lue Mallett-Motallebi, Jimmy Carl Duncan, Christopher Duchesne, John E. Clinton, Donald Joe Gordon, Misty Marie Payne, Dean Wagner, Anthony Maurice Owens, Leonard D. Morris, TyShaune Johnson, Jerry Matthews, Torrey Washington, Jimmy Anderson, Kenneth Brown, Silvester Bailey, Leo Cleere, III, Pelarr Porter, Alfred F. Benson, Rickey Lee Peals, Leonard Byrd, Aaron C. Richardson, Sr., Darrin A. McLeod, Shyrra Larry, Gregory Gooden, Charlene Byrd, Diana Carol Cash, Lafindric Ford, Robert Godfrey, Arnita Edge, Jasmine Nixon, Joseph Hinnen, Mary Polk-McClinnaham, James S. Alemisis, Ronald Shelton, Benjamin Hood, Kathleen Dokich, Virgil Barnett, William R. Brown, Larry Oliver, Daniel Grewon, Lela M. Smith, Keith Lyons, Roy Rice, Darryl Wheatley, Eddie J. Pollnitz, Jr., Shawn Salter, John Doe 2, Terrerce Smith, Ronald Davis, Bedricka Young, John E. Dolan, Henry James Peters, Sr., Nafanzo Glass, Tamar L. Whitley-Wilson, John Smith, Pamela Hamilton, Tracy Butler, Arnold Lyons, Gregory Sanders, Gayle Dorskly, Derita James, David Ruffin, Lindsey Roberts, Timothy Leroy Anderson, Lesley Perez, Cathy B. Lord, Brian Richard Beasley, Jamoni Mayhan, Douglas Edwards, Joyce D. Stephens, Caroline Kennedy, Steven Wilson, Rashard Reed, Lois Diane Facyson-Spencer, Kenneth M. Whitmore, Samuel McGill, Rodney Creaie Williams, John Doe 3, Maurice Scruggs, Garth Leigh Dare, Frank E. Allen, Carol Denise Lovejoy, David Stephan Glenn, Henry Deininger, Derrick Flowers, Patricia K. Haskins, Jacqueline A. Morris, Michael Jerinic, Juanita Hubbard, Darryl W. Donnell, Sherrlena Coleman, Ray D. Moore, Matthew Vega, Onyx Deramus, Kathleen Mendrala Clark, Jeffery Atkins, Grace Kimama, Laroya Donyae Lewis, Janet Yates, Valerie Williams, George Jamison, Angela Jackson, Tracy Durham, Peter Christensen, Norman Bradley, Eleen Arboine, Audrea Harris, Lasean D. Lyles, Martha Rogers, Javier Fernando Vasquez, Blair Watters, Edna Fleming, Terry Snodgrass, Samuel Miller, Brenda Shorter, Bobby I. Watts, Maurice Footrail, Edward Tomlin, III, Isabel Paret, Melvin Moore, Jason Carter, Damion Wynn, Erice Howell, Kendrick Ivory, Royce Smith, Valerie Gainous, Jason Roberts, Brenda Droskiewicz, David L. Phillips, Hattie Allen, Gregg Harold Marvin, Michael Williams, Rayford B. Howard, Rodney White, Annie Frazier, Patsy Ann McCart, Richard A. Nelson, Landia Doretha Dinkins, Carol B. Phipps, Theodore A. Smith, Elviria Fort, Michael T. Tedd, Mitchell Hall, Aamira Mosely, James Carbonell, Ann M. Smart, Ruth Ellen Hansen, Sheila B. Dillon, Mark Johnson, Jennifer Butler, John M. Dickey, Jerry Gilden, Michael Kenneth McNeil, Louis McKnight, Jr., Aubrey W. Capers, Royslan McConnell, Johnathan S. Armstrong, Jamica Hitchcock, Kimberly Adams, Christopher Brown, Marty Simms, Sr., Stanley Curtis Blair, Credence Harris, Austin Johnson, Charles Blake, Carl Stewart, Angelo Reid, Ronney Fuller, Monty Johnson, Jillaine Springer, Clifford Reynolds, Michael Willis, Thomas Andrew Hale, Lyndon Merricks, Ronald R. Rolling, Oscar Bartley, Vincent D. Weatherly, Muhammad Mateen, Cuong Nguyen, Eddie McLamore, Roberto Enrique Rodriguez-Cruz, Eduardo Villarreal, Jacquline M. Carter, LaShawna M. Whitehead, Danney M. Jeter, Claudia Pillado Salas, Kris Hinds, JoAnn Ardito-Hagenberg, Jamila F. Wilkinson, Sr., Lisa L. Casey, Jennifer Redmon, John Robert Quinlan, Deanthony King, Alisa Diane Holley, Melvin Crum, Faraha McCray, Lee Clark, Kevin Johnson, Nina Baker, Willis Richard Baker, Juan Maldonado, Malcolm D. Steele, Kevin Watson, Nelson Johnson, Joseph Michael Festa, Terry R. Tucker, Sr., Kenneth Ray Johnson, Marilyn Tatum, James Arace, Samuel R. Robinson, Antoinette Barton, Marc Steinbach, Letitia Hawkins, Kelly Weston, George Murray, Nancy Hernandez, Edward Nickolas, Maurice Thompson-Najera, Michelle M. Scott, Evelynne Muse, James W. McCarron, Shedennia Greggs Archie, Malcom Martin, Billy Busby, Jr., Jodie D. Dunbar, Marcelle Morris, Randolph Boone, Kathleen D. Griffith, Daniel Snodgrass, Edgar Ceja Chairez, Kyneshia Rainey, Luis Ismael Mazariegos, Jr., James Moore, Alex Byron Willis, Marcellus K. Brothers, Rachel Samantha Armstrong, Timothy S. Stroud, Charles Clay, Charles Marrow, Dick L. Mahan, Bernice Duarte, Allen Anderson, Jane Doe 3, Consandra Crawford, Alfonso J. Williams, Khadija Plowden, Bertha Lee Houston, Theresa Holsey, Victor Carrasco, Karen Smith, Shatara Dixon, Robert Young, Ronnie Sanks, Mamie Key, Odessa Harris, Billy Gene Derr, Linda Bersamina, Yvonne Cook, James Holman, Dwight Morrison, William Blouin, Cedric D. Smith, Atta Trent, Karen M. Palmer, LaTasha Stephens, Jared Williams, David T. Williams, Melissa Artison, Nikko Ann Hill, Eldon Borgen, William Washington, Jr., Oleevya Williams, Henry Busby, Jeffrey R. Koker, Rynnaill Payton, Adam Patasky, Lee Magnuson, Marilyn Harden Stewart, John Doe 6, John Doe 4, Tyler Andrew Price, Caren Simmons, Francis Rubet, Maricsha Dillard, Antonio Rodriguez, David E. Overton, Sr., Efrain Toro, Hasan Singleton, Halbert Caldwell, Ryan Snead, Gilmer Dycus, II, Evan Hamilton, Anthony Paul Blow, Jarrod Sanders, Kevin Allen, Tiffany Daniels, Max Cabezas Palomino, Amy D. Mooney, Karen Costner, Kelvin Broughton, Charlie Davis, Barbara Hughes, Terry Bernard Hunt, Judy Garcia, Shana G. Goodloe, Ernest Jett, Linus Altman, Terri Lashawn Williams, Johnnie Robinson-Walker, Robert Antonio Clay, Tangela Jordan, Shaniqua Carpenter, Edward Sanders, Ona Viola Atkins, Lashonda Mitchell, Brandon Tenorio, Eric Hall, Vernon L. Holmes, Dennis Earl Satterwhite, Boyce G. Rock, Aaron D. King, Johnnie E. Norman, Kenneth Jahron Williams, Felix Otero, Jr., Time Thomas, Sr., Clarisse Jordan, Deborah Shudy, Billy H. Wynne, Tyshun Robinson, Odessa Valentine, Diane Parker, Thelma Brown, Larry Butler, Richard Nelson, James L. Wilder, Hatari Farmer, Jared Don Hawthorne, Montrell Cobbs, Erik Harris, Montrellia Bush, Kristal Brown, Alithia Owens, Trevor Martin, Brenda Valcarcel, Michael Robinson, John Maynard, Stephanie Jackson, Robert Gunn, John H. Mitchell, Kimberly Jones, Emmanuel L. Wade, Warrick Harvey, Steven Ray Maynard, David Eugene Larry, Kevin Uhrin, Adam Pettway, Alphonso Greggs, Lavell Thomas, Dale Conrad, Sammie Harrell, Veronica T. Seabron, Jane Doe 2, Kasmar Cheatham, Victor Javier Martinez, Lorraine Carpenter, Jamil F. Wilkinson, Sr., Jodie Denise Dunbar, James Sprio Alemisis, William Royce Brown, Vernon Lee Holmes, Victor M. Carrasco and Veronica Terrie Seabron
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05816
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND re #1 Complaint filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Plaintffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference previously set for 2/10/2020 has been continued to 2/13/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 28 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/30/2019, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (133 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2020. (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/24/2019, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (129 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Transcript Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ) Redaction Request due 11/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/24/2019. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2019. by noon Joint or Competing Proposed Case Schedules due by 12/6/2019. Telephone Conference set for 12/5/2019 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2020 by noon. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. FTR Time: 2:06- 3:12. Plaintiff Attorney: Holley: Anne Johnson; Jones: Nicholas Drakulich, Raymond Silverman, Christine Durant. Defendant Attorney: Alycia Degen, Joshua Anderson. Attachment: minute order. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Purposes by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (126) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST.Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-06972-JST, 4:19-cv-05816-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Purposes filed by Kimberly Adams, James Sprio Alemisis, Yolanda Alicea, Frank E. Allen, Hattie Allen, Kevin Allen, Linus Altman, Allen Anderson, Jimmy Anderson, Timothy Leroy Anderson, James Arace, Eleen Arboine, Shedennia Greggs Archie, JoAnn Ardito-Hagenberg, Johnathan S. Armstrong, Rachel Samantha Armstrong, Melissa Artison, Jeffery Atkins, Ona Viola Atkins, Silvester Bailey, Nina Baker, Willis Richard Baker, Virgil Barnett, Oscar Bartley, Antoinette Barton, Brian Richard Beasley, Alfred F. Benson, Linda Bersamina, Stanley Curtis Blair, Charles Blake, William Blouin, Anthony Paul Blow, Randolph Boone, Eldon Borgen, Norman Bradley, Marcellus K. Brothers, Kelvin Broughton, Christopher Brown, Kenneth Brown, Kristal Brown, Thelma Brown, William Royce Brown, Wayne L. Bullard, Billy Busby, Jr, Henry Busby, Montrellia Bush, Jennifer Butler, Larry Butler, Tracy Butler, Charlene Byrd, Leonard Byrd, Halbert Caldwell, Aubrey W. Capers, James Carbonell, Lorraine Carpenter, Shaniqua Carpenter, Victor M. Carrasco, Jacquline M. Carter, Jason Carter, Lisa L. Casey, Diana Carol Cash, Edgar Ceja Chairez, Kasmar Cheatham, Peter Christensen, Kathleen Mendrala Clark, Lee Clark, Charles Clay, Robert Antonio Clay, Leo Cleere, III, John E. Clinton, Montrell Cobbs, Sherrlena Coleman, Dale Conrad, Yvonne Cook, Karen Costner, Consandra Crawford, Melvin Crum, Tiffany Daniels, Garth Leigh Dare, Charlie Davis, Ronald Davis, Henry Deininger, Onyx Deramus, Billy Gene Derr, Jason Devore, John M. Dickey, Maricsha Dillard, Sheila B. Dillon, Landia Doretha Dinkins, Shatara Dixon, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 6, Kathleen Dokich, John E. Dolan, Darryl W. Donnell, Gayle Dorskly, Brenda Droskiewicz, Bernice Duarte, Christopher Duchesne, Jodie Denise Dunbar, Jimmy Carl Duncan, Tracy Durham, Gilmer Dycus, II, Arnita Edge, Douglas Edwards, Lois Diane Facyson-Spencer, Hatari Farmer, Joseph Michael Festa, Edna Fleming, Derrick Flowers, Maurice Footrail, Lafindric Ford, Elviria Fort, Annie Frazier, Ronney Fuller, Valerie Gainous, Judy Garcia, Jerry Gilden, Nafanzo Glass, David Stephan Glenn, Robert Godfrey, Gregory Gooden, Shana G. Goodloe, Donald Joe Gordon, Alphonso Greggs, Daniel Grewon, Kathleen D. Griffith, Robert Gunn, Thomas Andrew Hale, Eric Hall, Mitchell Hall, Evan Hamilton, Pamela Hamilton, Ruth Ellen Hansen, Sammie Harrell, Audrea Harris, Credence Harris, Erik Harris, Odessa Harris, Warrick Harvey, Patricia K. Haskins, Letitia Hawkins, Jared Don Hawthorne, Nancy Hernandez, Nikko Ann Hill, Kris Hinds, Joseph Hinnen, Jamica Hitchcock, Alisa Diane Holley, James Holman, Vernon Lee Holmes, Theresa Holsey, Benjamin Hood, Bertha Lee Houston, Rayford B. Howard, Erice Howell, Juanita Hubbard, Barbara Hughes, Terry Bernard Hunt, Kendrick Ivory, Angela Jackson, Stephanie Jackson, Derita James, George Jamison, Michael Jerinic, Danney M. Jeter, Ernest Jett, Austin Johnson, Kenneth Ray Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Mark Johnson, Monty Johnson, Nelson Johnson, TyShaune Johnson, Kimberly Jones, Clarisse Jordan, Tangela Jordan, Caroline Kennedy, Mamie Key, Grace Kimama, Aaron D. King, Deanthony King, Jeffrey R. Koker, David Eugene Larry, Shyrra Larry, Laroya Donyae Lewis, Cathy B. Lord, Carol Denise Lovejoy, Lasean D. Lyles, Arnold Lyons, Keith Lyons, Lee Magnuson, Dick L. Mahan, Juan Maldonado, Lue Mallett-Motallebi, Charles Marrow, Malcom Martin, Trevor Martin, Victor Javier Martinez, Gregg Harold Marvin, Muhammad Mateen, Jerry Matthews, Jamoni Mayhan, John Maynard, Steven Ray Maynard, Luis Ismael Mazariegos, Jr, James W. McCarron, Patsy Ann McCart, Royslan McConnell, Faraha McCray, Samuel McGill, Louis McKnight, Jr, Eddie McLamore, Darrin A. McLeod, Michael Kenneth McNeil, Lyndon Merricks, Samuel Miller, John H. Mitchell, Lashonda Mitchell, Amy D. Mooney, James Moore, Melvin Moore, Ray D. Moore, Jacqueline A. Morris, Leonard D. Morris, Marcelle Morris, Dwight Morrison, Aamira Mosely, George Murray, Evelynne Muse, Richard A. Nelson, Richard Nelson, Cuong Nguyen, Edward Nickolas, Jasmine Nixon, Johnnie E. Norman, Larry Oliver, Felix Otero, Jr, David E. Overton, Sr, Alithia Owens, Anthony Maurice Owens, Karen M. Palmer, Max Cabezas Palomino, Isabel Paret, Diane Parker, Adam Patasky, Misty Marie Payne, Rynnaill Payton, Rickey Lee Peals, Lesley Perez, Henry James Peters, Sr, Adam Pettway, David L. Phillips, Carol B. Phipps, Khadija Plowden, Mary Polk-McClinnaham, Eddie J. Pollnitz, Jr, Pelarr Porter, Tyler Andrew Price, John Robert Quinlan, Kyneshia Rainey, Jennifer Redmon, Rashard Reed, Angelo Reid, Clifford Reynolds, Roy Rice, Aaron C. Richardson, Sr, Jason Roberts, Lindsey Roberts, Michael Robinson, Samuel R. Robinson, Tyshun Robinson, Johnnie Robinson-Walker, Boyce G. Rock, Antonio Rodriguez, Roberto Enrique Rodriguez-Cruz, Martha Rogers, Ronald R. Rolling, Francis Rubet, David Ruffin, Claudia Pillado Salas, Shawn Salter, Edward Sanders, Gregory Sanders, Jarrod Sanders, Ronnie Sanks, Dennis Earl Satterwhite, Michelle M. Scott, Maurice Scruggs, Veronica Terrie Seabron, Ronald Shelton, Brenda Shorter, Deborah Shudy, Caren Simmons, Marty Simms, Sr, Hasan Singleton, Ann M. Smart, Cedric D. Smith, John Smith, Karen Smith, Lela M. Smith, Royce Smith, Terrerce Smith, Theodore A. Smith, Ryan Snead, Daniel Snodgrass, Terry Snodgrass, Jillaine Springer, Malcolm D. Steele, Marc Steinbach, Joyce D. Stephens, LaTasha Stephens, Carl Stewart, Marilyn Harden Stewart, Timothy S. Stroud, Marilyn Tatum, Michael T. Tedd, Brandon Tenorio, Lavell Thomas, Time Thomas, Sr, Maurice Thompson-Najera, Edward Tomlin, III, Efrain Toro, Atta Trent, Terry R. Tucker, Sr, Kevin Uhrin, Brenda Valcarcel, Odessa Valentine, Javier Fernando Vasquez, Matthew Vega, Eduardo Villarreal, Emmanuel L. Wade, Dean Wagner, Torrey Washington, William Washington, Jr, Kevin Watson, Blair Watters, Bobby I. Watts, Vincent D. Weatherly, Kelly Weston, Darryl Wheatley, Rodney White, LaShawna M. Whitehead, Tamar L. Whitley-Wilson, Kenneth M. Whitmore, James L. Wilder, Jamil F. Wilkinson, Sr, Alfonso J. Williams, David T. Williams, Jared Williams, Kenneth Jahron Williams, Michael Williams, Oleevya Williams, Rodney Creaie Williams, Terri Lashawn Williams, Valerie Williams, Alex Byron Willis, Michael Willis, Steven Wilson, Damion Wynn, Billy H. Wynne, Janet Yates, Bedricka Young, Robert Young and Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 10/23/2019) Modified on 10/24/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Aamira Mosely. (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 10/17/2019) Modified on 10/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RELATING CASES: 18-cv-6972 and 19-cv-5816. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gilead Sciences, Inc... (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Daniel A. Spira.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Daniel A. Spira (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13745106) filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spira, Daniel) (Filed on 9/27/2019) Modified on 9/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Inn-Young Park (Park, Inn-Young) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Elaine Pole (Pole, Debra) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alycia Ann Degen (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Eugene Anderson (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aamira Mosely. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Katrina R. Ashley's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Robert Carl Hillard's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Katrina R. Ashley (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13723243) filed by Kimberly Adams, James Sprio Alemisis, Yolanda Alicea, Frank E. Allen, Hattie Allen, Kevin Allen, Linus Altman, Allen Anderson, Jimmy Anderson, Timothy Leroy Anderson, James Arace, Eleen Arboine, Shedennia Greggs Archie, JoAnn Ardito-Hagenberg, Johnathan S. Armstrong, Rachel Samantha Armstrong, Melissa Artison, Jeffery Atkins, Ona Viola Atkins, Silvester Bailey, Nina Baker, Willis Richard Baker, Virgil Barnett, Oscar Bartley, Antoinette Barton, Brian Richard Beasley, Alfred F. Benson, Linda Bersamina, Stanley Curtis Blair, Charles Blake, William Blouin, Anthony Paul Blow, Randolph Boone, Eldon Borgen, Norman Bradley, Marcellus K. Brothers, Kelvin Broughton, Christopher Brown, Kenneth Brown, Kristal Brown, Thelma Brown, William Royce Brown, Wayne L. Bullard, Billy Busby, Jr, Henry Busby, Montrellia Bush, Jennifer Butler, Larry Butler, Tracy Butler, Charlene Byrd, Leonard Byrd, Halbert Caldwell, Aubrey W. Capers, James Carbonell, Lorraine Carpenter, Shaniqua Carpenter, Victor M. Carrasco, Jacquline M. Carter, Jason Carter, Lisa L. Casey, Diana Carol Cash, Edgar Ceja Chairez, Kasmar Cheatham, Peter Christensen, Kathleen Mendrala Clark, Lee Clark, Charles Clay, Robert Antonio Clay, Leo Cleere, III, John E. Clinton, Montrell Cobbs, Sherrlena Coleman, Dale Conrad, Yvonne Cook, Karen Costner, Consandra Crawford, Melvin Crum, Tiffany Daniels, Garth Leigh Dare, Charlie Davis, Ronald Davis, Henry Deininger, Onyx Deramus, Billy Gene Derr, Jason Devore, John M. Dickey, Maricsha Dillard, Sheila B. Dillon, Landia Doretha Dinkins, Shatara Dixon, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 6, Kathleen Dokich, John E. Dolan, Darryl W. Donnell, Gayle Dorskly, Brenda Droskiewicz, Bernice Duarte, Christopher Duchesne, Jodie Denise Dunbar, Jimmy Carl Duncan, Tracy Durham, Gilmer Dycus, II, Arnita Edge, Douglas Edwards, Lois Diane Facyson-Spencer, Hatari Farmer, Joseph Michael Festa, Edna Fleming, Derrick Flowers, Maurice Footrail, Lafindric Ford, Elviria Fort, Annie Frazier, Ronney Fuller, Valerie Gainous, Judy Garcia, Jerry Gilden, Nafanzo Glass, David Stephan Glenn, Robert Godfrey, Gregory Gooden, Shana G. Goodloe, Donald Joe Gordon, Alphonso Greggs, Daniel Grewon, Kathleen D. Griffith, Robert Gunn, Thomas Andrew Hale, Eric Hall, Mitchell Hall, Evan Hamilton, Pamela Hamilton, Ruth Ellen Hansen, Sammie Harrell, Audrea Harris, Credence Harris, Erik Harris, Odessa Harris, Warrick Harvey, Patricia K. Haskins, Letitia Hawkins, Jared Don Hawthorne, Nancy Hernandez, Nikko Ann Hill, Kris Hinds, Joseph Hinnen, Jamica Hitchcock, Alisa Diane Holley, James Holman, Vernon Lee Holmes, Theresa Holsey, Benjamin Hood, Bertha Lee Houston, Rayford B. Howard, Erice Howell, Juanita Hubbard, Barbara Hughes, Terry Bernard Hunt, Kendrick Ivory, Angela Jackson, Stephanie Jackson, Derita James, George Jamison, Michael Jerinic, Danney M. Jeter, Ernest Jett, Austin Johnson, Kenneth Ray Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Mark Johnson, Monty Johnson, Nelson Johnson, TyShaune Johnson, Kimberly Jones, Clarisse Jordan, Tangela Jordan, Caroline Kennedy, Mamie Key, Grace Kimama, Aaron D. King, Deanthony King, Jeffrey R. Koker, David Eugene Larry, Shyrra Larry, Laroya Donyae Lewis, Cathy B. Lord, Carol Denise Lovejoy, Lasean D. Lyles, Arnold Lyons, Keith Lyons, Lee Magnuson, Dick L. Mahan, Juan Maldonado, Lue Mallett-Motallebi, Charles Marrow, Malcom Martin, Trevor Martin, Victor Javier Martinez, Gregg Harold Marvin, Muhammad Mateen, Jerry Matthews, Jamoni Mayhan, John Maynard, Steven Ray Maynard, Luis Ismael Mazariegos, Jr, James W. McCarron, Patsy Ann McCart, Royslan McConnell, Faraha McCray, Samuel McGill, Louis McKnight, Jr, Eddie McLamore, Darrin A. McLeod, Michael Kenneth McNeil, Lyndon Merricks, Samuel Miller, John H. Mitchell, Lashonda Mitchell, Amy D. Mooney, James Moore, Melvin Moore, Ray D. Moore, Jacqueline A. Morris, Leonard D. Morris, Marcelle Morris, Dwight Morrison, Aamira Mosely, George Murray, Evelynne Muse, Richard A. Nelson, Richard Nelson, Cuong Nguyen, Edward Nickolas, Jasmine Nixon, Johnnie E. Norman, Larry Oliver, Felix Otero, Jr, David E. Overton, Sr, Alithia Owens, Anthony Maurice Owens, Karen M. Palmer, Max Cabezas Palomino, Isabel Paret, Diane Parker, Adam Patasky, Misty Marie Payne, Rynnaill Payton, Rickey Lee Peals, Lesley Perez, Henry James Peters, Sr, Adam Pettway, David L. Phillips, Carol B. Phipps, Khadija Plowden, Mary Polk-McClinnaham, Eddie J. Pollnitz, Jr, Pelarr Porter, Tyler Andrew Price, John Robert Quinlan, Kyneshia Rainey, Jennifer Redmon, Rashard Reed, Angelo Reid, Clifford Reynolds, Roy Rice, Aaron C. Richardson, Sr, Jason Roberts, Lindsey Roberts, Michael Robinson, Samuel R. Robinson, Tyshun Robinson, Johnnie Robinson-Walker, Boyce G. Rock, Antonio Rodriguez, Roberto Enrique Rodriguez-Cruz, Martha Rogers, Ronald R. Rolling, Francis Rubet, David Ruffin, Claudia Pillado Salas, Shawn Salter, Edward Sanders, Gregory Sanders, Jarrod Sanders, Ronnie Sanks, Dennis Earl Satterwhite, Michelle M. Scott, Maurice Scruggs, Veronica Terrie Seabron, Ronald Shelton, Brenda Shorter, Deborah Shudy, Caren Simmons, Marty Simms, Sr, Hasan Singleton, Ann M. Smart, Cedric D. Smith, John Smith, Karen Smith, Lela M. Smith, Royce Smith, Terrerce Smith, Theodore A. Smith, Ryan Snead, Daniel Snodgrass, Terry Snodgrass, Jillaine Springer, Malcolm D. Steele, Marc Steinbach, Joyce D. Stephens, LaTasha Stephens, Carl Stewart, Marilyn Harden Stewart, Timothy S. Stroud, Marilyn Tatum, Michael T. Tedd, Brandon Tenorio, Lavell Thomas, Time Thomas, Sr, Maurice Thompson-Najera, Edward Tomlin, III, Efrain Toro, Atta Trent, Terry R. Tucker, Sr, Kevin Uhrin, Brenda Valcarcel, Odessa Valentine, Javier Fernando Vasquez, Matthew Vega, Eduardo Villarreal, Emmanuel L. Wade, Dean Wagner, Torrey Washington, William Washington, Jr, Kevin Watson, Blair Watters, Bobby I. Watts, Vincent D. Weatherly, Kelly Weston, Darryl Wheatley, Rodney White, LaShawna M. Whitehead, Tamar L. Whitley-Wilson, Kenneth M. Whitmore, James L. Wilder, Jamil F. Wilkinson, Sr, Alfonso J. Williams, David T. Williams, Jared Williams, Kenneth Jahron Williams, Michael Williams, Oleevya Williams, Rodney Creaie Williams, Terri Lashawn Williams, Valerie Williams, Alex Byron Willis, Michael Willis, Steven Wilson, Damion Wynn, Billy H. Wynne, Janet Yates, Bedricka Young, Robert Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Robert C. Hillard (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13723217) filed by Kimberly Adams, James Sprio Alemisis, Yolanda Alicea, Frank E. Allen, Hattie Allen, Kevin Allen, Linus Altman, Allen Anderson, Jimmy Anderson, Timothy Leroy Anderson, James Arace, Eleen Arboine, Shedennia Greggs Archie, JoAnn Ardito-Hagenberg, Johnathan S. Armstrong, Rachel Samantha Armstrong, Melissa Artison, Jeffery Atkins, Ona Viola Atkins, Silvester Bailey, Nina Baker, Willis Richard Baker, Virgil Barnett, Oscar Bartley, Antoinette Barton, Brian Richard Beasley, Alfred F. Benson, Linda Bersamina, Stanley Curtis Blair, Charles Blake, William Blouin, Anthony Paul Blow, Randolph Boone, Eldon Borgen, Norman Bradley, Marcellus K. Brothers, Kelvin Broughton, Christopher Brown, Kenneth Brown, Kristal Brown, Thelma Brown, William Royce Brown, Wayne L. Bullard, Billy Busby, Jr, Henry Busby, Montrellia Bush, Jennifer Butler, Larry Butler, Tracy Butler, Charlene Byrd, Leonard Byrd, Halbert Caldwell, Aubrey W. Capers, James Carbonell, Lorraine Carpenter, Shaniqua Carpenter, Victor M. Carrasco, Jacquline M. Carter, Jason Carter, Lisa L. Casey, Diana Carol Cash, Edgar Ceja Chairez, Kasmar Cheatham, Peter Christensen, Kathleen Mendrala Clark, Lee Clark, Charles Clay, Robert Antonio Clay, Leo Cleere, III, John E. Clinton, Montrell Cobbs, Sherrlena Coleman, Dale Conrad, Yvonne Cook, Karen Costner, Consandra Crawford, Melvin Crum, Tiffany Daniels, Garth Leigh Dare, Charlie Davis, Ronald Davis, Henry Deininger, Onyx Deramus, Billy Gene Derr, Jason Devore, John M. Dickey, Maricsha Dillard, Sheila B. Dillon, Landia Doretha Dinkins, Shatara Dixon, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 6, Kathleen Dokich, John E. Dolan, Darryl W. Donnell, Gayle Dorskly, Brenda Droskiewicz, Bernice Duarte, Christopher Duchesne, Jodie Denise Dunbar, Jimmy Carl Duncan, Tracy Durham, Gilmer Dycus, II, Arnita Edge, Douglas Edwards, Lois Diane Facyson-Spencer, Hatari Farmer, Joseph Michael Festa, Edna Fleming, Derrick Flowers, Maurice Footrail, Lafindric Ford, Elviria Fort, Annie Frazier, Ronney Fuller, Valerie Gainous, Judy Garcia, Jerry Gilden, Nafanzo Glass, David Stephan Glenn, Robert Godfrey, Gregory Gooden, Shana G. Goodloe, Donald Joe Gordon, Alphonso Greggs, Daniel Grewon, Kathleen D. Griffith, Robert Gunn, Thomas Andrew Hale, Eric Hall, Mitchell Hall, Evan Hamilton, Pamela Hamilton, Ruth Ellen Hansen, Sammie Harrell, Audrea Harris, Credence Harris, Erik Harris, Odessa Harris, Warrick Harvey, Patricia K. Haskins, Letitia Hawkins, Jared Don Hawthorne, Nancy Hernandez, Nikko Ann Hill, Kris Hinds, Joseph Hinnen, Jamica Hitchcock, Alisa Diane Holley, James Holman, Vernon Lee Holmes, Theresa Holsey, Benjamin Hood, Bertha Lee Houston, Rayford B. Howard, Erice Howell, Juanita Hubbard, Barbara Hughes, Terry Bernard Hunt, Kendrick Ivory, Angela Jackson, Stephanie Jackson, Derita James, George Jamison, Michael Jerinic, Danney M. Jeter, Ernest Jett, Austin Johnson, Kenneth Ray Johnson, Kevin Johnson, Mark Johnson, Monty Johnson, Nelson Johnson, TyShaune Johnson, Kimberly Jones, Clarisse Jordan, Tangela Jordan, Caroline Kennedy, Mamie Key, Grace Kimama, Aaron D. King, Deanthony King, Jeffrey R. Koker, David Eugene Larry, Shyrra Larry, Laroya Donyae Lewis, Cathy B. Lord, Carol Denise Lovejoy, Lasean D. Lyles, Arnold Lyons, Keith Lyons, Lee Magnuson, Dick L. Mahan, Juan Maldonado, Lue Mallett-Motallebi, Charles Marrow, Malcom Martin, Trevor Martin, Victor Javier Martinez, Gregg Harold Marvin, Muhammad Mateen, Jerry Matthews, Jamoni Mayhan, John Maynard, Steven Ray Maynard, Luis Ismael Mazariegos, Jr, James W. McCarron, Patsy Ann McCart, Royslan McConnell, Faraha McCray, Samuel McGill, Louis McKnight, Jr, Eddie McLamore, Darrin A. McLeod, Michael Kenneth McNeil, Lyndon Merricks, Samuel Miller, John H. Mitchell, Lashonda Mitchell, Amy D. Mooney, James Moore, Melvin Moore, Ray D. Moore, Jacqueline A. Morris, Leonard D. Morris, Marcelle Morris, Dwight Morrison, Aamira Mosely, George Murray, Evelynne Muse, Richard A. Nelson, Richard Nelson, Cuong Nguyen, Edward Nickolas, Jasmine Nixon, Johnnie E. Norman, Larry Oliver, Felix Otero, Jr, David E. Overton, Sr, Alithia Owens, Anthony Maurice Owens, Karen M. Palmer, Max Cabezas Palomino, Isabel Paret, Diane Parker, Adam Patasky, Misty Marie Payne, Rynnaill Payton, Rickey Lee Peals, Lesley Perez, Henry James Peters, Sr, Adam Pettway, David L. Phillips, Carol B. Phipps, Khadija Plowden, Mary Polk-McClinnaham, Eddie J. Pollnitz, Jr, Pelarr Porter, Tyler Andrew Price, John Robert Quinlan, Kyneshia Rainey, Jennifer Redmon, Rashard Reed, Angelo Reid, Clifford Reynolds, Roy Rice, Aaron C. Richardson, Sr, Jason Roberts, Lindsey Roberts, Michael Robinson, Samuel R. Robinson, Tyshun Robinson, Johnnie Robinson-Walker, Boyce G. Rock, Antonio Rodriguez, Roberto Enrique Rodriguez-Cruz, Martha Rogers, Ronald R. Rolling, Francis Rubet, David Ruffin, Claudia Pillado Salas, Shawn Salter, Edward Sanders, Gregory Sanders, Jarrod Sanders, Ronnie Sanks, Dennis Earl Satterwhite, Michelle M. Scott, Maurice Scruggs, Veronica Terrie Seabron, Ronald Shelton, Brenda Shorter, Deborah Shudy, Caren Simmons, Marty Simms, Sr, Hasan Singleton, Ann M. Smart, Cedric D. Smith, John Smith, Karen Smith, Lela M. Smith, Royce Smith, Terrerce Smith, Theodore A. Smith, Ryan Snead, Daniel Snodgrass, Terry Snodgrass, Jillaine Springer, Malcolm D. Steele, Marc Steinbach, Joyce D. Stephens, LaTasha Stephens, Carl Stewart, Marilyn Harden Stewart, Timothy S. Stroud, Marilyn Tatum, Michael T. Tedd, Brandon Tenorio, Lavell Thomas, Time Thomas, Sr, Maurice Thompson-Najera, Edward Tomlin, III, Efrain Toro, Atta Trent, Terry R. Tucker, Sr, Kevin Uhrin, Brenda Valcarcel, Odessa Valentine, Javier Fernando Vasquez, Matthew Vega, Eduardo Villarreal, Emmanuel L. Wade, Dean Wagner, Torrey Washington, William Washington, Jr, Kevin Watson, Blair Watters, Bobby I. Watts, Vincent D. Weatherly, Kelly Weston, Darryl Wheatley, Rodney White, LaShawna M. Whitehead, Tamar L. Whitley-Wilson, Kenneth M. Whitmore, James L. Wilder, Jamil F. Wilkinson, Sr, Alfonso J. Williams, David T. Williams, Jared Williams, Kenneth Jahron Williams, Michael Williams, Oleevya Williams, Rodney Creaie Williams, Terri Lashawn Williams, Valerie Williams, Alex Byron Willis, Michael Willis, Steven Wilson, Damion Wynn, Billy H. Wynne, Janet Yates, Bedricka Young, Robert Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Jacqueline A. Morris, Jacquline M. Carter, James Arace, James Carbonell, James Holman, James L. Wilder, James Moore, James S. Alemisis, James W. McCarron, Jamica Hitchcock, Jamila F. Wilkinson, Sr, Jamoni Mayhan, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Janet Yates, Jared Don Hawthorne, Jared Williams, Jarrod Sanders, Jasmine Nixon, Jason Carter, Jason Devore, Jason Roberts, Javier Fernando Vasquez, Jeffery Atkins, Jeffrey R. Koker, Jennifer Butler, Jennifer Redmon, Jerry Gilden, Jerry Matthews, Jillaine Springer, Jimmy Anderson, Jimmy Carl Duncan, JoAnn Ardito-Hagenberg, Jodie D. Dunbar, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 6, John E. Clinton, John E. Dolan, John H. Mitchell, John M. Dickey, John Maynard, John Robert Quinlan, John Smith, Johnathan S. Armstrong, Johnnie Robinson-Walker, Johnnie E. Norman, Joseph Hinnen, Joseph Michael Festa, Joyce D. Stephens, Juan Maldonado, Juanita Hubbard, Judy Garcia, Karen Costner, Karen M. Palmer, Karen Smith, Kasmar Cheatham, Kathleen D. Griffith, Kathleen Dokich, Kathleen Mendrala Clark, Keith Lyons, Kelly Weston, Kelvin Broughton, Kendrick Ivory, Kenneth Brown, Kenneth Jahron Williams, Kenneth M. Whitmore, Kenneth Ray Johnson, Kevin Allen, Kevin Johnson, Kevin Uhrin, Kevin Watson, Khadija Plowden, Kimberly Adams, Kimberly Jones, Kris Hinds, Kristal Brown, Kyneshia Rainey, Lafindric Ford, Landia Doretha Dinkins, Laroya Donyae Lewis, Larry Butler, Larry Oliver, Lasean D. Lyles, LaShawna M. Whitehead, Lashonda Mitchell, LaTasha Stephens, Lavell Thomas, Lee Clark, Lee Magnuson, Lela M. Smith, Leo Cleere, III, Leonard Byrd, Leonard D. Morris, Lesley Perez, Letitia Hawkins, Linda Bersamina, Lindsey Roberts, Linus Altman, Lisa L. Casey, Lois Diane Facyson-Spencer, Lorraine Carpenter, Louis McKnight, Jr, Lue Mallett-Motallebi, Luis Ismael Mazariegos, Jr, Lyndon Merricks, Malcolm D. Steele, Malcom Martin, Mamie Key, Marc Steinbach, Marcelle Morris, Marcellus K. Brothers, Maricsha Dillard, Marilyn Harden Stewart, Marilyn Tatum, Mark Johnson, Martha Rogers, Marty Simms, Sr, Mary Polk-McClinnaham, Matthew Vega, Maurice Footrail, Maurice Scruggs, Maurice Thompson-Najera, Max Cabezas Palomino, Melissa Artison, Melvin Crum, Melvin Moore, Michael Jerinic, Michael Kenneth McNeil, Michael Robinson, Michael T. Tedd, Michael Williams, Michael Willis, Michelle M. Scott, Misty Marie Payne, Mitchell Hall, Montrell Cobbs, Montrellia Bush, Monty Johnson, Muhammad Mateen, Nafanzo Glass, Nancy Hernandez, Nelson Johnson, Nikko Ann Hill, Nina Baker, Norman Bradley, Odessa Harris, Odessa Valentine, Oleevya Williams, Ona Viola Atkins, Onyx Deramus, Oscar Bartley, Pamela Hamilton, Patricia K. Haskins, Patsy Ann McCart, Pelarr Porter, Peter Christensen, Rachel Samantha Armstrong, Randolph Boone, Rashard Reed, Ray D. Moore, Rayford B. Howard, Richard A. Nelson, Richard Nelson, Rickey Lee Peals, Robert Antonio Clay, Robert Godfrey, Robert Gunn, Robert Young, Roberto Enrique Rodriguez-Cruz, Rodney Creaie Williams, Rodney White, Ronald Davis, Ronald R. Rolling, Ronald Shelton, Ronney Fuller, Ronnie Sanks, Roy Rice, Royce Smith, Royslan McConnell, Ruth Ellen Hansen, Ryan Snead, Rynnaill Payton, Sammie Harrell, Samuel McGill, Samuel Miller, Samuel R. Robinson, Shana G. Goodloe, Shaniqua Carpenter, Shatara Dixon, Shawn Salter, Shedennia Greggs Archie, Sheila B. Dillon, Sherrlena Coleman, Shyrra Larry, Silvester Bailey, Stanley Curtis Blair, Stephanie Jackson, Steven Ray Maynard, Steven Wilson, Tamar L. Whitley-Wilson, Tangela Jordan, Terrerce Smith, Terri Lashawn Williams, Terry Bernard Hunt, Terry R. Tucker, Sr, Terry Snodgrass, Thelma Brown, Theodore A. Smith, Theresa Holsey, Thomas Andrew Hale, Tiffany Daniels, Time Thomas, Sr, Timothy Leroy Anderson, Timothy S. Stroud, Torrey Washington, Tracy Butler, Tracy Durham, Trevor Martin, Tyler Andrew Price, TyShaune Johnson, Tyshun Robinson, Valerie Gainous, Valerie Williams, Vernon L. Holmes, Veronica T. Seabron, Victor Javier Martinez, Victor Carrasco, Vincent D. Weatherly, Virgil Barnett, Warrick Harvey, Wayne L. Bullard, William Blouin, William R. Brown, William Washington, Jr, Willis Richard Baker, Yolanda Alicea and Yvonne Cook. (This is a text-only entry.) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint,, and have been added to this case: Barbara Hughes, Bedricka Young, Benjamin Hood, Bernice Duarte, Bertha Lee Houston, Billy Busby, Jr, Billy Gene Derr, Billy H. Wynne, Blair Watters, Bobby I. Watts, Boyce G. Rock, Brandon Tenorio, Brenda Droskiewicz, Brenda Shorter, Brenda Valcarcel, Brian Richard Beasley, Caren Simmons, Carl Stewart, Carol B. Phipps, Carol Denise Lovejoy, Caroline Kennedy, Cathy B. Lord, Cedric D. Smith, Charlene Byrd, Charles Blake, Charles Clay, Charles Marrow, Charlie Davis, Christopher Brown, Christopher Duchesne, Clarisse Jordan, Claudia Pillado Salas, Clifford Reynolds, Consandra Crawford, Credence Harris, Cuong Nguyen, Dale Conrad, Damion Wynn, Daniel Grewon, Daniel Snodgrass, Danney M. Jeter, Darrin A. McLeod, Darryl W. Donnell, Darryl Wheatley, David E. Overton, Sr, David Eugene Larry, David L. Phillips, David Ruffin, David Stephan Glenn, David T. Williams, Dean Wagner, Deanthony King, Deborah Shudy, Dennis Earl Satterwhite, Derita James, Derrick Flowers, Diana Carol Cash, Diane Parker, Dick L. Mahan, Donald Joe Gordon, Douglas Edwards, Dwight Morrison, Eddie J. Pollnitz, Jr, Eddie McLamore, Edgar Ceja Chairez, Edna Fleming, Eduardo Villarreal, Edward Nickolas, Edward Sanders, Edward Tomlin, III, Efrain Toro, Eldon Borgen, Eleen Arboine, Elviria Fort, Emmanuel L. Wade, Eric Hall, Erice Howell, Erik Harris, Ernest Jett, Evan Hamilton, Evelynne Muse, Faraha McCray, Felix Otero, Jr, Francis Rubet, Frank E. Allen, Garth Leigh Dare, Gayle Dorskly, George Jamison, George Murray, Gilmer Dycus, II, Grace Kimama, Gregg Harold Marvin, Gregory Gooden, Gregory Sanders, Halbert Caldwell, Hasan Singleton, Hatari Farmer, Hattie Allen, Henry Busby, Henry Deininger, Henry James Peters, Sr and Isabel Paret. (This is a text-only entry.) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (with jury demand) (no process) against Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13713386). Filed byAlphonso Greggs, Antonio Rodriguez, Alfonso J. Williams, Audrea Harris, Aaron C. Richardson, Sr, Annie Frazier, Arnita Edge, Aamira Mosely, Anthony Maurice Owens, Ann M. Smart, Amy D. Mooney, Arnold Lyons, Alex Byron Willis, Aubrey W. Capers, Austin Johnson, Aaron D. King, Alisa Diane Holley, Alithia Owens, Angelo Reid, Antoinette Barton, Angela Jackson, Alfred F. Benson, Adam Patasky, Atta Trent, Anthony Paul Blow, Allen Anderson, Adam Pettway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice Letter), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/19/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosely et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne L. Bullard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Alicea
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Devore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lue Mallett-Motallebi
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Carl Duncan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Duchesne
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Clinton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Joe Gordon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Marie Payne
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Wagner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Maurice Owens
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard D. Morris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TyShaune Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Matthews
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrey Washington
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Anderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvester Bailey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Cleere, III
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pelarr Porter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred F. Benson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Lee Peals
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Byrd
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron C. Richardson, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin A. McLeod
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shyrra Larry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Gooden
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Byrd
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Carol Cash
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafindric Ford
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Godfrey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnita Edge
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Nixon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hinnen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Polk-McClinnaham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Alemisis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Shelton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Hood
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Dokich
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Barnett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Oliver
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Grewon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela M. Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Lyons
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Rice
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Wheatley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie J. Pollnitz, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Salter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrerce Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedricka Young
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Dolan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry James Peters, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nafanzo Glass
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar L. Whitley-Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hamilton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Butler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Lyons
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sanders
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Dorskly
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derita James
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ruffin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Roberts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Leroy Anderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Perez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy B. Lord
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Richard Beasley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamoni Mayhan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Edwards
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce D. Stephens
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Kennedy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashard Reed
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Diane Facyson-Spencer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth M. Whitmore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel McGill
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Creaie Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 3
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Scruggs
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth Leigh Dare
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank E. Allen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Denise Lovejoy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stephan Glenn
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Deininger
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Flowers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia K. Haskins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline A. Morris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jerinic
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Hubbard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl W. Donnell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrlena Coleman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray D. Moore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Vega
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyx Deramus
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mendrala Clark
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Atkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Kimama
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laroya Donyae Lewis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Yates
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jamison
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Jackson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Durham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Christensen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Bradley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleen Arboine
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrea Harris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasean D. Lyles
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Rogers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Fernando Vasquez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair Watters
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Fleming
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Snodgrass
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Miller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Shorter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby I. Watts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Footrail
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Tomlin, III
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Paret
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Moore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Carter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion Wynn
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erice Howell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Ivory
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royce Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Gainous
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Roberts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Droskiewicz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Phillips
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Allen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Harold Marvin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayford B. Howard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney White
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Frazier
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Ann McCart
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Nelson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landia Doretha Dinkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol B. Phipps
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore A. Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elviria Fort
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Tedd
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Hall
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aamira Mosely
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carbonell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann M. Smart
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ellen Hansen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila B. Dillon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Butler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Dickey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Gilden
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kenneth McNeil
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis McKnight, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey W. Capers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royslan McConnell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan S. Armstrong
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamica Hitchcock
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Adams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Simms, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Curtis Blair
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Credence Harris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Blake
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Stewart
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Reid
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronney Fuller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillaine Springer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Reynolds
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Willis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Andrew Hale
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Merricks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R. Rolling
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Bartley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent D. Weatherly
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Mateen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuong Nguyen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie McLamore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Enrique Rodriguez-Cruz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Villarreal
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquline M. Carter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShawna M. Whitehead
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danney M. Jeter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Pillado Salas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Hinds
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Ardito-Hagenberg
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamila F. Wilkinson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa L. Casey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Redmon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Quinlan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanthony King
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Diane Holley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Crum
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faraha McCray
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Clark
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Baker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Richard Baker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Maldonado
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm D. Steele
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Watson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Festa
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry R. Tucker, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Tatum
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arace
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel R. Robinson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Barton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Steinbach
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letitia Hawkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Weston
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Murray
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hernandez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Nickolas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Thompson-Najera
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle M. Scott
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelynne Muse
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. McCarron
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedennia Greggs Archie
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcom Martin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Busby, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie D. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelle Morris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Boone
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen D. Griffith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Snodgrass
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Ceja Chairez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyneshia Rainey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ismael Mazariegos, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Byron Willis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellus K. Brothers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Samantha Armstrong
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy S. Stroud
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Clay
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Marrow
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dick L. Mahan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Duarte
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Anderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 3
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consandra Crawford
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso J. Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khadija Plowden
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Lee Houston
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Holsey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shatara Dixon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Young
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Sanks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Key
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odessa Harris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Gene Derr
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bersamina
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Cook
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Holman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Morrison
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Blouin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric D. Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlet