Great Bowery, Inc. v. Apartment 34 Media LLC et al
Plaintiff: Great Bowery Inc
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, APARTMENT 34 MEDIA LLC, INC. and Apartment 34 Media LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv05843
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. FINDING AS MOOT #14 Defendant's motion to dismiss in light of #15 Plaintiff's amended complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Response to Order to Show Cause by Apartment 34 Media LLC. (Emanuel, Sacha) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 8, 2019 Set Deadline, See Docket No. 16 : Statement due by 11/13/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING Defendant TO SHOW CAUSE why the #14 motion to dismiss should not be terminated as moot in light of #15 Plaintiff's amended complaint. Defendant shall file a statement of two pages or less by November 13, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apartment 34 Media LLC. Filed byGreat Bowery Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Basria, Saba) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Complaint filed by Apartment 34 Media LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/8/2019. Replies due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Emanuel, Sacha) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond filed by Apartment 34 Media LLC. and Great Bowery, Inc. (Emanuel, Sacha) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 7, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by December 31st. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-05843-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 10/04/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Great Bowery Inc.. (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great Bowery Inc (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Apartment 34 Media LLC. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2019 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Great Bowery Inc . (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19)] re #1 . 4 Complaint, filed by Great Bowery Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by GREAT BOWERY INC. d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apartment 34 Media LLC, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13718805.) Filed by Great Bowery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Basria, Saba) (Filed on 9/19/2019) Modified on 9/19/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Bowery, Inc. v. Apartment 34 Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APARTMENT 34 MEDIA LLC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apartment 34 Media LLC
Represented By: Sacha Vincente Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Bowery Inc
Represented By: Saba Ali Basria
Represented By: Mathew Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?