Dzhantaev v. McAleenen et al
Plaintiff: Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Kevin McAleenen, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar and Kevin McAleenen
Case Number: 4:2019cv05852
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE re Remand to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #12 Stipulation to Remand Case to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Signed on 10/10/2019.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Remanding Case to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Pursuant to 8 U.S.C. 1447(b) filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Kevin McAleenen and Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Kevin McAleenen.. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev.. (Naim, Amir) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #2 Amir Ahmad Naim's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Kevin McAleenen, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev (Naim, Amir) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Naim, Amir) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. The Certi ficate of Interested Entities should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file the Certificate of Interested Entities only in its entirety. Re:[3-3] Certification of Interested Parties filed by Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct even t can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file the SUMMONS ONLY in its entirety. Re:[3-2] Summons filed by Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for Naturalization against All Defendants. Filed byDeni Khasanovich Dzhantaev. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Certification of Interested Parties)(Naim, Amir) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13720404.) filed by Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev. (Naim, Amir) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Naturalization against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13720380). Filed byDeni Khasanovich Dzhantaev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Naim, Amir) (Filed on 9/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dzhantaev v. McAleenen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Kevin McAleenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenen
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deni Khasanovich Dzhantaev
Represented By: Amir Ahmad Naim
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?