Fine et al v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Andrew Fine and Tammy Federman SEP/IRA
Defendant: Arthur D. Levinson, Craig Federighi, Ronald D. Sugar, Apple Inc., James A. Bell, Luca Maestri, Timothy D. Cook, Andrea Jung, Susan L. Wagner, Albert Gore, Jr. and Robert A. Iger
Case Number: 4:2019cv05863
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #28 Stipulation Staying Action. This action is stayed until 3/11/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 29 *** Amended*** Direct Reassignment Order. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings re #25 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019) Modified on 10/16/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AND JOINT STATEMENT STAYING ACTION filed by Apple Inc., James A. Bell, Timothy D. Cook, Craig Federighi, Albert Gore, Jr., Robert A. Iger, Andrea Jung, Arthur D. Levinson, Luca Maestri, Ronald D. Sugar, Susan L. Wagner, Andrew Fine, et al. (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/15/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2019 **Vacated Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Lucy H. Koh per case reassignment. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 *** AMENDED*** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings E [25) Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 DOCKTED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #27 *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings E [25) Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/11/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] GRANTING UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED AND ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-2033-YGR and 5:19-cv-5863-LHK. Within five (5) business days of this order, the parties in Fine shall file a joint statement regarding the manner in which the Fine action will proceed given the other actions currently pending. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/11/2019. The parties are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge immediately after the case number. Any case management conference in any reassigned case will be rescheduled by the Court. The parties shall adjust the dates for the conference, disclosures and report required by FRCivP 16 and 26 accordingly. Unless otherwise ordered, any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be re- noticed by the moving party before the newly assigned judge; any deadlines set by the ADR Local Rules remain in effect; and any deadlines established in a case management order continue to govern, except dates for appearance in court, which will be rescheduled by the newly assigned judge. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Apple Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Susan L. Wagner waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Robert A. Iger waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Ronald D. Sugar waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by James A. Bell waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Andrea Jung waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Albert Gore, Jr. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Arthur D. Levinson waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Craig Federighi waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Luca Maestri waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. Service waived by Timothy D. Cook waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer (Kramer, James) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Haag (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for January 22, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine, The Rosenfeld Family Foundation.. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Katz). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David C. Katz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13736316.) filed by Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine, The Rosenfeld Family Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Katz, David) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine, The Rosenfeld Family Foundation re #1 Complaint,, (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., James A. Bell, Timothy D. Cook, Craig Federighi, Albert Gore, Jr., Robert A. Iger, Andrea Jung, Arthur D. Levinson, Luca Maestri, Ronald D. Sugar, Susan L. Wagner ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13722507.). Filed byThe Rosenfeld Family Foundation, Tammy Federman SEP/IRA, Andrew Fine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification of Andrew Fine, #3 Verification of Tammy Federman, #4 Verification of the Rosenfeld Family Foundation)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 9/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fine et al v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur D. Levinson
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Federighi
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Sugar
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Bell
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luca Maestri
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Cook
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Jung
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Wagner
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Gore, Jr.
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Iger
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rosenfeld Family Foundation
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Represented By: David C Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Fine
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Represented By: David C Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Federman SEP/IRA
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Represented By: David C Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?