Davis v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Plaintiff: Gloria Davis
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Case Number: 4:2019cv05866
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Re Docket No. 16. July 2nd Hearing Date is Vacated. **Disregard Docket No. 20 .*** (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #21 .*** CLERK'S NOTICE Re Docket No. #16 . July 2nd Hearing Date is Vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/30/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/1/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2020 Filing 19 Letter Re: Request to Amend and Extension of Time to Locate Counsel from Gloria Davis. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint With Prejudice ) filed byKaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Manisco, Kacie) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint With Prejudice) filed by Gloria Davis. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint With Prejudice; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/9/2020. Replies due by 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals' Motion To Dismiss Complaint With Prejudice)(Hayes, Aaron) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gloria Davis. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 Please Give me an Extension re #12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gloria Davis. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/20/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/14/2020.Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Initial Case Management Conference NOT held on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2020)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Amendment to #1 Complaint and Proof of Service by Gloria Davis. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Right to Sue by Gloria Davis re #1 Complaint, (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gloria Davis. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2020 and Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/23/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/20/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Submit Additional Documentation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12 /12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Filing fee $ 400.00, Receipt No. 44611016532). Filed by Gloria Davis. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?