Aftechmobile Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Aftechmobile Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05902
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aftechmobile Inc... (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/22/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Aftechmobile Inc. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/7/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aftechmobile Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dynamic IP Deals LLC for Aftechmobile Inc.. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13725030.). Filed by Aftechmobile Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aftechmobile Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aftechmobile Inc.
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?