Thomas v. Vulcan Materials Company et al
Plaintiff: Gary Price Thomas
Defendant: Teamsters Local 853, Mark Gleason, Calmat Company, Philip Miller, Mike Yates, Jeff Nehmens, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665 and Vulcan Materials Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv06042
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 OBJECTIONS to re #22 Notice (Other) Objection of Defendants Vulcan Materials Company, Calmat Co. dba Shamrock Materials, Jeffrey Nehmens, and Philip Miller to Plaintiff's Judicial Notice of General Conspiracy Statute 18 USC Section 371 Against All Defendants by Calmat Company, Philip Miller, Jeff Nehmens, Vulcan Materials Company. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum of OBJECTIONS to re #22 Notice by Mark Gleason, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665, Teamsters Local 853, Mike Yates. (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 JUDICIAL NOTICE of General Federal Conspiracy Statute 18 U.S.C. 371- Against All Defendants FRCP, 201 by Gary Price Thomas (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 Affidavit Plaintiff Motion In Opposition of Proposed Order Granting the Union Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and #15 Proposed Order re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed by Gary Price Thomas. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTIONS to ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer of Defendants Vulcan Materials Company, Calmat Co. dba Shamrock Materials, Jeffrey Nehmens, and Philip Miller to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages re #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), by Gary Price Thomas. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gary Price Thomas. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Calmat Company, Philip Miller, Jeff Nehmens, Vulcan Materials Company.. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Mark Gleason, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665, Teamsters Local 853, Mike Yates. (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Gleason, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665, Teamsters Local 853, Mike Yates.. (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Gleason, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665, Teamsters Local 853, Mike Yates (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Mark Gleason, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665, Teamsters Local 853, Mike Yates. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 10/16/2019. Replies due by 10/23/2019. (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Philip Miller. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeff Nehmens (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Calmat Company identifying Other Affiliate Vulcan Materials Company, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Calmat Company. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vulcan Materials Company identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Vulcan Materials Company. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer of Defendants Vulcan Materials Company, Calmat Co. dba Shamrock Materials, Jeffrey Nehmens, and Philip Miller to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages byCalmat Company, Philip Miller, Jeff Nehmens, Vulcan Materials Company. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 ***PER FILER, INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED, REFILED AT DKT. #7 *** ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer of Defendants Vulcan Materials Company, Calmat Co. dba Shamrock Materials, Jeffrey Nehmens, and Philip Miller to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages byCalmat Company, Philip Miller, Jeff Nehmens, Vulcan Materials Company. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Gleason, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665, Teamsters Local 853, Mike Yates re #1 Notice of Removal, and Other Court Documents (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/ 21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Mark Gleason, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 665, Teamsters Local 853, Mike Yates . (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit the Civil Cover Sheet ONLY using Civil Eve nts > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Marin. Their case number is CIV1903236. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13736435). Filed byMark Gleason, Mike Yates, Teamsters Local 665, Rodney Smith, Teamsters Local 853. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Consent to Removal by Defendants Vulcan Materials Company, Calmat Co. dba Shamrock Materials, Jeff Nehmens, and Phil Miller)(Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 9/25/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Vulcan Materials Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 853
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gleason
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calmat Company
Represented By: Catherine Mi Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Miller
Represented By: Catherine Mi Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Yates
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Nehmens
Represented By: Catherine Mi Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Smith
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 665
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vulcan Materials Company
Represented By: Catherine Mi Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Price Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?