Lee v. Barclays Capital Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael J Lee and Michael J. Lee
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv06147
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 2/3/2020 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #5 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.**COUNSEL PLEASE USE CORRECT INITIALS FOR THE JUDGE IN YOUR FILINGS. THE CORRECT INITIALS ARE YGR. ** (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT by Barclays Capital Inc. (Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 11/1/2019) Modified on 11/4/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to re #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Barclays Capital Inc.. (Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/25/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barclays Capital Inc... (Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/15/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Barclays Capital Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 10/18/2019. Replies due by 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Barclays Capital Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. (Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1441(C), and 1446 [Federal Question] from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CSM-19-861458, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13744919). Filed by Barclays Capital Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 9/27/2019) Modified on 10/1/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Tamar Gabriel Ellyin
Represented By: Behzad Ben Mohandesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?