Khan v. City of Pinole Police Department et al
Plaintiff: AK, David Khan and Nay Zar Tun Kyaw
Defendant: City of Pinole & Employees, City of Daly City & Employees, City Manager Mitchel Feitzer, City of Pinole Police Department, Contra Costa County District Attorney, Eric Casher, San Mateo County & Employees, Det. John Corcoran, Ronaldo Lemus Bermudes, Phyllis Redmond, Officer Patrick Rude, Contra Costa County & Employees, Officer Zachery Blume, Officer Badge #216/359, Paula Velazquez Gonzalez, Daly City Police Department, Off. J.E. Williams, Off. Brandon Scholes, Officer Linda Segundo, San Mateo County District Attorney, Sergeant Justin Rogers, Officer Christian Keister, Chief Neil H. Gang, Inspector Darryl Holcombe and Jason Huntchison
Case Number: 4:2019cv06316
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are incorrect Re: #15 Waiver Service of Summons filed by City of Daly City & Employees. Counsel need not re-file the document, but sho uld reference the correct judge initials as YGR after the case number, and correctly reflected on your document as 4:19-cv-06316-YGR on future filings. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons for CITY OF DALY CITY ONLY filed by City of Daly City & Employees. (Master, Todd) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; granting #12 Motion to Stay Proceedings until 12/3/2019. Initial CMC set 2/24/2020. Case Management Statements filed by 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 2/24/2020 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Case is not related. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/6/19. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019) Modified on 11/7/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Proceeding filed by AK, David Khan, Nay Zar Tun Kyaw. Responses due by 11/15/2019. Replies due by 11/22/2019. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP.Referred sua sponte to Hon. Richard Seeborg for consideration of whether the case is related to Nay Zar Tun Kyaw v. Justin Rogers et al., 17-cv-5548-RS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Mateo County & Employees, San Mateo County District Attorney.. (Charles, Joseph) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by David Khan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Khan.. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND REFERRING PLAINTIFFS to Federal Pro Bono Project. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Khan, Nay Zar Tun Kyaw. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zachery Blume, Eric Casher, City of Daly City & Employees, City of Pinole & Employees, City of Pinole Police Department, Contra Costa County & Employees, Contra Costa County District Attorney, John Corcoran, Daly City Police Department, Mitchel Feitzer, Neil H. Gang, Paula Velazquez Gonzalez, Darryl Holcombe, Jason Huntchison, Christian Keister, Officer Badge #216/359, Phyllis Redmond, Justin Rogers, Patrick Rude, San Mateo County & Employees, San Mateo County District Attorney, Brandon Scholes, Linda Segundo, J.E. Williams. Filed byDavid Khan. Consent/Declination due by 10/16/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. City of Pinole Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nay Zar Tun Kyaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pinole & Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Daly City & Employees
Represented By: Todd Holton Master
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Manager Mitchel Feitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pinole Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Casher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County & Employees
Represented By: Joseph Francis Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. John Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronaldo Lemus Bermudes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Patrick Rude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County & Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Zachery Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Badge #216/359
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Velazquez Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daly City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off. J.E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off. Brandon Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Linda Segundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County District Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Francis Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Justin Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christian Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Neil H. Gang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspector Darryl Holcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Huntchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?