Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Plaintiff: Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited and Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 4:2019cv06349
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty Inc., Other Affiliate National Union Fir Insurance of Pittsburgh, PA for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Hartley, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND on all issues so triable. by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Hartley, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2019) Modified on 11/20/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc, Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S. Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Hartley, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. (Hartley, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #11 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Kim, Debbie) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2020. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2020 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/9/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited.. (Kieffer, Kevin) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. (Kieffer, Kevin) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add ALL interested parties that were listed. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate par ents.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. (Kieffer, Kevin) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kieffer, Kevin) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Equitable Contribution; Equitable Indemnity; Equitable Subrogation against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13765339.). Filed byHartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kieffer, Kevin) (Filed on 10/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited
Represented By: Kevin F. Kieffer
Represented By: Ryan C Tuley
Represented By: Debbie Kim
Represented By: Debbie H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin F. Kieffer
Represented By: Ryan C Tuley
Represented By: Debbie Kim
Represented By: Debbie H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: David Peter Crochetiere
Represented By: Michael James Hartley
Represented By: Artyom Baghdishyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?