Pikal v. Dropbox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Pikal
Defendant: R. Bryan Schreier, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Andrew W. Houston, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P., Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Allen & Company LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Margaret C. Whitman, Piper Jaffray & Co., Condoleezza Rice, Donald W. Blair, Ajay V. Vashee, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Timothy J. Regan, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Paul E. Jacobs, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Canaccord Genuity LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, SC XII Management, LLC and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv06360
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Allen & Company LLC, Donald W. Blair, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Andrew W. Houston, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Paul E. Jacobs, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Timothy J. Regan, Condoleezza Rice, SC XII Management, LLC, R. Bryan Schreier, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P., Ajay V. Vashee, Margaret C. Whitman. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bryan Pikal Notice of Publication of Securities Class Action Notice (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Please Resubmit Proposed Summons Listing all defendants on One Summons. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Bryan Pikal. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 10/25/2019. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Correction of clerical error on category. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bryan Pikal re #1 Complaint,,, (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 ***REFILED AT DKT. #9 ***Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against Allen & Company LLC, Donald W. Blair, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Andrew W. Houston, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Paul E. Jacobs, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Timothy J. Regan, Condoleezza Rice, SC XII Management, LLC, R. Bryan Schreier, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P., Ajay V. Vashee, Margaret C. Whitman ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13766430.). Filed byBryan Pikal. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pikal v. Dropbox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bryan Schreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew W. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dropbox, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arash Ferdowsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMP Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret C. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condoleezza Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajay V. Vashee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Mylod, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital XII, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canaccord Genuity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC XII Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Pikal
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?