Martin v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kimberly Martin
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv06585
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 11/20/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE UPON CONSENT, See Docket Nos. #10 and #11 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/20/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kimberly Martin.. (Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Schapel, Amanda) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re: #7 D eclaration in Support, filed by Kimberly Martin (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental Declaration of Joshua B. Kons / Kimberly Martin in Support of #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kimberly Martin. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 10/31/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING #2 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/21/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kimberly Martin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byKimberly Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kons, Joshua) (Filed on 10/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Martin
Represented By: Joshua Bradford Kons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Amanda Schapel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?