Harris v. Bullard et al
Plaintiff: Zackary T. Harris, Sr.
Defendant: Thomas Feimer, Joe Kelleher, Judge Blum, Elvis Cook, Lake County Jail, Brenden Bullard, Edward Savin, Officer Audiss, Officer Hobbs, Sgt.Jimenez, Ms Abelson, Anakalia Sullivan, Captain Taylor, Officer O'Reilly, Officer Eagle, C/O Hartman and Susan Krones
Case Number: 4:2019cv06648
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
2 Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING #6 REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Amended Complaint/ Amended Petition due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 20, 2019 Sent plaintiff letter re: copies of rules not provided and copy of docket sheet. (aea, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Zackary T. Harris, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 11/04/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST For Informa Pauperis Application Form and Rules of the Court. re #3 Clerk's Notice re: IFP by Zackary T. Harris, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/1/2019 a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Request for F.R.C.P. Rules of Court and Order Lake County Jail. Sgt. Bussard To Provide a 6 Mo. Trust Acct Statement, Also Issue a TRO on Bussard [See Plaintiff's Attached Affidavit in Support of TRO] filed by Zackary T. Harris, Sr. Responses due by 11/29/2019. Replies due by 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019) Modified on 10/31/2019 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zackary T. Harris, Sr.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/25/2019. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zackary T. Harris, Sr. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byZackary T. Harris, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement Note, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Bullard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Feimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenden Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Savin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Audiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt.Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anakalia Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Krones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zackary T. Harris, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?