Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. et al v. IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. and Samsung America, Inc.
Defendant: IXI IP, LLC and IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv06773
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of G. William Foster. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of G. William Foster ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13863187.) filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung America, Inc.. (Foster, George) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 21, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 14, 2020. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-06773-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 11/01/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASE to 15-cv-3752-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/31/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David Rokach representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Todd M. Friedman representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gregory S. Arovas representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Rokach ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13826148.) filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung America, Inc.. (Rokach, David) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Todd Friedman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13825958.) filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung America, Inc.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Gregory S. Arovas ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13825795.) filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung America, Inc.. (Arovas, Gregory) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to IXI IP, LLC, IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/1/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Hugh Brown (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (7,039,033) (cc: form mailed to register). (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung America, Inc. (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung America, Inc. (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgement of Preclusion, Noninfringement, and Invalidity against IXI IP, LLC, IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13807958.). Filed bySamsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Brandon) (Filed on 10/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. et al v. IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd.
Represented By: Brandon Hugh Brown
Represented By: George William Foster
Represented By: Gregory S. Arovas
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: David Rokach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung America, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Hugh Brown
Represented By: George William Foster
Represented By: Gregory S. Arovas
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: David Rokach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IXI IP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?