Toland v. Saul
Plaintiff: Scott Christopher Toland
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv06875
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Kenney, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Christopher Toland. Scott Christopher Toland served on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cho, Young) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Cho, Young) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-13881400). (Cho, Young) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee in full no later than November 15, 2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Christopher Toland.. (Cho, Young) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Cho, Young) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Scott Christopher Toland. (Cho, Young) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Andrew Saul. Filed byScott Christopher Toland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cho, Young) (Filed on 10/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toland v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Christopher Toland
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?