United States of America v. Klapper
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Peter Klapper
Case Number: 4:2019cv06890
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3545
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Peter Klapper. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/7/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (fee waived) against Peter Klapper. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 10/23/2019) Modified on 10/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Klapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Klapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy Talburt Matchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?