Dorrough Music Publishing Company et al v. Fillmore Entertainment Group L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Pure Love Music, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Dorrough Music Publishing, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Dorrough Music Publishing Company and Ultra International Music Publishing
Defendant: Lily Nguyen and Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv07063
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re: #14 C ertificate of Service, filed by Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Trill Productions, Ultra International Music Publishing, Pure Love Music, Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc. re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #11 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, #1 Complaint,, #5 Certificate of Interested Entities,, #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #9 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination, #7 Summons Issued, #8 Copyright Action (Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Fillmore Entertainment Group, LLC) (Havens, Cassandra) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 11, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by February 4th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-07063-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dorrough Music Publishing Company.. (Havens, Cassandra) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C., Lily Nguyen. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Naughty Mu sic, Neutral Gray Music, Trill Productions, Ultra International Music Publishing, Pure Love Music, Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc. Document is Proposed Summons. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers for Dorrough Music Publishing, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.. re #1 Complaint, (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Pure Love Music, Trill Productions, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report On The Filing Or Determination of An Action Or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Neutral Gray Music, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Pure Love Music, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Dorrough Music Publishing, Trill Productions, Naughty Music as to Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C., Lily Nguyen. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Copyright Act against Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C., Lily Nguyen (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13830693.). Filed by Neutral Gray Music, Mouse On Tha Track LLC, Pure Love Music, Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Dorrough Music Publishing Company, Trill Productions, Naughty Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorrough Music Publishing Company et al v. Fillmore Entertainment Group L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lily Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fillmore Entertainment Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultra International Music Publishing d/b/a/ Ultra Tunes
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mouse On Tha Track LLC
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Love Music
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naughty Music
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neutral Gray Music
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrough Music Publishing
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trill Productions
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrough Music Publishing Company
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultra International Music Publishing
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?