In Re Sonoma West Medical Center
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Hoffman
Defendant: Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Gurpreet Singh and American Advanced Management Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv07080
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND PERMITTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/19. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #3 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Reply in Support of #3 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Errata to #6 Plaintiff's Request to Take Judicial Notice filed by Timothy W. Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19 - SSH Exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement)(Related document(s) #6 ) (MacConaghy, John) (Filed on 11/20/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Judicial Notice re #5 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byTimothy W. Hoffman, Timothy W. Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- "Main Case" Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Request for Payment of Administrative Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Declaration of Gurpreet Singh, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Declaration of John MacConaghy, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Declaration of Austin Wade, #6 Exhibit 6 -- 9/9/19 Transcript of Hearing, #7 Exhibit 7 -- 10/22/19 Transcript of Hearing, #8 Exhibit 8 -- Order for Examination, #9 Exhibit 9 -- Motion to Compel Turnover, #10 Exhibit 10 -- SSH Opposition to Motion to Compel Turnover, #11 Exhibit 11-- Order to Compel Turnover, #12 Exhibit 12 -- Application for OSC re Contempt, #13 Exhibit 13-- Declaration in Support thereof, #14 Exhibit 14-- OSC re Contempt, #15 Exhibit 15-- Withdrawal of OSC, #16 Exhibit 16 -- SSH Notice of Appearance, #17 Exhibit 17 -- Palm Drive Healthcare District Chapter 9 Plan, #18 Exhibit 18-- Palm Drive Healthcare District Disclosure Statment, #19 Exhibit 19 -- SSH exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement, #20 Exhibit 20 -- SSH exhibit to Palm Drive Disclosure Statement, #21 Exhibit 21 -- Order Confirming Palm Drive Plan, #22 Exhibit 22 -- "Adversary Proceeding" Docket Sheet, #23 Exhibit 23 -- Complaint -- Hoffman v. SSH et al, #24 Exhibit 24 -- Answer and Counterclaim -- Hoffman v. SSH et al, #25 Exhibit 25 -- Answer to Counterclaim)(Related document(s) #5 ) (MacConaghy, John) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to #3 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Reference to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Timothy W. Hoffman, Timothy W. Hoffman. (MacConaghy, John) (Filed on 11/19/2019) Modified on 11/20/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING ON #3 MOTION OF DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE: Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Motion of Defendants and Counterclaimants for Withdrawal of Reference filed by American Advanced Management Group, Inc., American Advanced Management Group, Inc., Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/20/2019. Replies due by 11/27/2019. (Polard, Steven) (Filed on 11/6/2019) Modified on 11/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:18-BK-10665-RLE; AP 19-01030. Filed by Gurpreet Singh, Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC, American Advanced Management Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration, #4 Docket Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Sonoma West Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma Specialty Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Steven G. Polard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurpreet Singh
Represented By: Steven G. Polard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Advanced Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Polard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Hoffman
Represented By: John H. MacConaghy
Represented By: John Harrington MacConaghy, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?